California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 5:24-cv-01636
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2024
Terminated:Aug 07, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2025 12:27 AM PST
Defendant
Judge Stodghill K Bryan
Plaintiff
Devin Kyle Wade
Reg. No. 79459-112 3430 Cogswell Road
El Monte, CA 91732


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, September 06, 2024
10 10 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 09/10 11:18 AM
AMENDED CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Devin Kyle Wade, (es)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
9 9 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 09/10 11:16 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Devin Kyle Wade (es)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
8 8 notice Deficiency - Writ of Execution (CV-52c) - optional html form Tue 09/03 5:18 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: WRIT OF EXECUTION AND ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. The document is being returned to you for correction of: There is no judgment entered on this case. (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
7 7 notice Deficiency - Writ of Execution (CV-52c) - optional html form Tue 09/03 10:55 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE WRIT OF EXECUTION AND ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. The document is being returned to you for correction of: There is no judgment entered on this case. (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
6 6 notice Deficiency - Writ of Execution (CV-52c) - optional html form Tue 08/27 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION AND ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. The document is being returned to you for correction of: There is no judgment entered on this case. (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
5 5 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Wed 08/07 4:06 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Denying2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (NON-PRISONER CASE). SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
4 4 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 08/06 11:22 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Complaint - Related [+]1 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (car)
Related: [-] ferred
Monday, August 05, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Mon 08/05 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Mon 08/05 3:14 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Devin Wade. (car)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Referred) Mon 08/05 3:11 PM
COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, filed by Plaintiff Devin Wade. (car)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet