Delaware District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00052
Case Filed:May 09, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 07, 2024 3:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Manuel Villalobos-Gomez (1)
Represented By
Eleni Kousoulis
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Conor Wilson
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
David Jay Glassman
David Jay Glassman, Esquire
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jennifer K. Welsh
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/07/2024 5:21 AM EDT
Thursday, December 07, 2023
Arrest of Manuel Villalobos-Gomez. (twk) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Initial Appearance as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez held on 12/7/2023. Defendant was present with counsel (E. Kousoulis, Esq. from the FPD's Office appointed). Court advised counsel of their obligations under Brady v. Maryland; Govt. filed a Motion for Detention; Preliminary and Detention Hearings scheduled for 12/12/2023 at 2:30pm before Judge Christopher J. Burke. ATTENDEES: AUSA: J. Welsh, Esq.; Defendant: E. Kousoulis; USPO - J. Velez; Clerk - D. Benyo, T. Koehler. (twk) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT by Special Agent, DEA, confirmed and sworn to via telephone before Judge Christopher J. Burke as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez. (twk) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez. Appointment of Eleni Kousoulis, Esq. for Manuel Villalobos-Gomez. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/7/2023. (twk) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Detain Pending Trial by USA as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez. (twk) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez. Detention and Preliminary Hearings are set for 12/12/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom To Be Determined before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/7/2023. (twk) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER pursuant to, Brady v. Maryland, Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/7/2023. (twk) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Conor Wilson appearing for Manuel Villalobos-Gomez (Wilson, Conor) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Preliminary Hearing as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez held on 12/12/2023. Defendant was present with counsel. After hearing from both parties, the Court finds probable cause. (Clerk, Benyo) Attendees: J. Welsh for Government; C. Wilson for FPD; J. Velez for USPO. (dlb) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Defendant was present with counsel; Detention Hearing as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez held on 12/12/2023. After hearing proffer from both sides the Court denied Government's Motion for Detention. Defendant is ordered to be released on conditions pending trial, for the reasons stated on the record. (Clerk, Benyo) Attendees: Attendees: J. Welsh for Government; C. Wilson for FPD; J. Velez for USPO. (dlb) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER of Probable Cause as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez: Defendant is ordered to await further action by the Court. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/12/2023. (dlb) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
8 8 EXHIBIT and WITNESS LIST for Preliminary Hearing re Manuel Villalobos-Gomez (dlb) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez (1) O/R. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/12/2023. (dlb) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
10 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict and Exclusion of Time Under The Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez. (Welsh, Jennifer) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez granting10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict and Exclusion of Time Under The Speedy Trial Act. ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez. Time is excluded from 1/11/2024 until 3/11/2024. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/5/2024. (lih) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
12 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Jay Glassman, Esquire appearing for Manuel Villalobos-Gomez (dlb) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
13 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict and Exclusion of Time Under The Speedy Trial Act (Unopposed) by USA as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez. (Welsh, Jennifer) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez granting13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict and Exclusion of Time Under The Speedy Trial Act. ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice. Time is excluded from 3/11/2024 until 4/10/2024. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/11/2024. (lih) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
15 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict and Exclusion of Time Under The Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez. (Welsh, Jennifer) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
16 16 ORDER Granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Indictment as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez (1); Time excluded from 4/10/24 until 5/10/24. Signed by Judge Laura D. Hatcher on 4/23/24. (kjk) [1:23-mj-00515]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
17 17 FELONY INFORMATION with a Notice of Forfeiture as to Manuel Villalobos-Gomez (1) count(s) 1. (kjk) (kmd).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant Information Sheet
Att: 2 (8/6/2024) GP Signature