Republican Natl Cmte v. Wetzel
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cr-60395 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Case Filed: | Aug 06, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 07, 2024 3:16 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Justin Wetzel, in his official capacity as the clerk and registrar of the Circuit Court of Harrison County
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Toni Jo Diaz, in their official capacities as members of the Harrison County Election Commission
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Becky Payne, in their official capacities as members of the Harrison County Election Commission
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Barbara Kimball, in their official capacities as members of the Harrison County Election Commission
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Christene Brice, in their official capacities as members of the Harrison County Election Commission
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Carolyn Handler, in their official capacities as members of the Harrison County Election Commission
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Michael Watson, in his official capacity as the Secretary of State of Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Libertarian Party of Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Republican National Committee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
James Perry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Matthew Lamb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Mississippi Republican Party
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/07/2024 3:16 AM CDT |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Libertarian Party of Mississippi 24-60395 (RA) | ||
3 pgs CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [4] Parties added: Appellants Republican National Committee, James Perry, Matthew Lamb and Mississippi Republican Party. NOA filed by Appellants Mississippi Republican Party, Mr. Matthew Lamb, Mr. James Perry and Republican National Committee. [4] 24-60395 (RA) | ||
1 pgs COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Sherri Penny. 24-60395 (Sherri Penny ) | ||
4 pgs INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [11] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 08/21/2024 for Appellants Matthew Lamb, Libertarian Party of Mississippi, Mississippi Republican Party, James Perry and Republican National Committee. 24-60395 (RA) | ||
1 pgs APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. 24-60395 (Thomas McCarthy ) | ||
1 pgs APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. 24-60395 (T. Russell Nobile ) | ||
1 pgs APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. 24-60395 (Eric W. Lee ) |