Geiger et al v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04322 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Aug 07, 2024 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:24-cv-05402 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 07, 2024 12:15 PM EDT |
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Nation Ford Chemical Company 2300 Banks Street
Fort Mill, SC 29715 |
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Giametta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Graham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Goldstrom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keri Goldsmid
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marilyn Gunderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maurice Gilbert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc Gettleman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynn Gulley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynn Gulch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynn Gore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Gentert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lillian Gipson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leon Gibbons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lee Greengrass
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Gilbert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Gombert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xan Gilligan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Gullikson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Gold
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Virginia Gue
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vincent Geiger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terrance Groom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Griffiths
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stanley Goglia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Gernhard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melanie Graber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Goodwill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Gilliatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Grilley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Grimes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ralph Everett Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mercurey Goodman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clarke Gilbert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eli Goldhaber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Goldammer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donny Greene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald E. (Donny) Gillson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don Gohman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David George
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danni Gill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Damon Grubb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Courtney Gilliard Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Gibbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chong Gipson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad Govier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cathy Gravely
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Giggers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Grevious
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Geniusz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Grimes III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Gensler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Grubb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Giles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Anthony Grant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Greimann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joyce Gill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Giuffre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnny Glass
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Greenwood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Gerow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Gillespie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janina Giddens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Griser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Grigson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Goodenough
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Gilbert Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamaal Graham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Irene Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garry Goetz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Estate Of Ralph Gittings
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/10 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Wade, Robert Candiano, Michael Perone, Ernest Pickett, Felix Espinoza, John Farley, Deahn Connor, David Farrier, John Benchoff, Jacqueline Arcos, Richard Comer, Paula Edge, Oliver Dillard Jr, John Utt, Jr, Cecil Blain, Kevin Wittlieff, Adam Poirier, Kevin Gombert, Lynn Gore, Georgia Harris NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY LISTED PLAINTIFFS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 09/05 3:32 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/14 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Clark, Anthony Epling, Kevin Weeks, Arnold Fee, Harry Roberts, Edward Murphy, Eric Perkins, Leslie Fraraccio, Ronald Gullikson, Danny Hutchins, Janice Mcnie, Robert Orewiler, Robert Peterson, Lavetta Polk, Esau Richardson, Michael Wesolek, Walter Harris Without prejudice, as to listed plaintiffsAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 08/07 11:33 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:24-cv-05402, Geiger et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-4322-RMG (jbin) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 08/07 11:32 AM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-05402. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER (CTO-203) FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 7/31/2024) (tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/7/2024.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/7/2024.] | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/7/2024.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/7/2024.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/7/2024.] | ||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/7/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/7/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 152253/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29617496).Document filed by The 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/7/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint |