Pineiro v. City of New York et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Naomi Reice Buchwald |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-06002 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 07, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/22 6:03 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. City Of New York served on 8/22/2024, answer due 9/12/2024. Document filed by Stephanie Pineiro..(Leventhal, Jason) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/12 5:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Samuel Moskovitz on behalf of Stephanie Pineiro..(Moskovitz, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/08 3:29 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C.O. Will..(pc) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/08 3:29 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Captain King..(pc) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/08 3:28 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenneth Stukes..(pc) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/08 3:27 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Louis A. Molina..(pc) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/08 3:27 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York..(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 08/08 10:33 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 08/08 10:34 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 08/08 10:34 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 08/08 10:34 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jason Louis Leventhal. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 08/08 10:34 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jason Louis Leventhal. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JOHN or JANE DOE 1-10, Individually, JOHN or JANE DOE 11-20, Individually, CAPTAIN KING, Individually, LOUIS A. MOLINA, Individually, KENNETH STUKES, Individually, THE CITY OF NEW YORK, C.O. WILL, Individually, STEPHANIE PINEIRO. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; DO NOT ENTER ALL PARTIES IN ALL CAPS. (pc) |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 08/07 5:33 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C.O. WILL, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by STEPHANIE PINEIRO..(Leventhal, Jason) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 08/07 5:32 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CAPTAIN KING, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by STEPHANIE PINEIRO..(Leventhal, Jason) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 08/07 5:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KENNETH STUKES, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by STEPHANIE PINEIRO..(Leventhal, Jason) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 08/07 5:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LOUIS A. MOLINA, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by STEPHANIE PINEIRO..(Leventhal, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 08/07 5:29 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE CITY OF NEW YORK, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by STEPHANIE PINEIRO..(Leventhal, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 08/07 5:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Leventhal, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/07 5:27 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHN or JANE DOE 1-10, Individually, JOHN or JANE DOE 11-20, Individually, CAPTAIN KING, Individually, LOUIS A. MOLINA, Individually, KENNETH STUKES, Individually, THE CITY OF NEW YORK, C.O. WILL, Individually. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29719654)Document filed by STEPHANIE PINEIRO..(Leventhal, Jason) |