Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert D Berger
Case #: 2:24-bk-21015
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2024
Dismissed:Sep 30, 2024
Terminated:Oct 23, 2024

Debtor
Benefit Management, LLC
2015 16th St
Great Bend, KS 67530-4030
Represented By
Andrew J Nazar
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Patricia E Hamilton
Stevens and Brand, LLP 4848 SW 21st St, Ste 201
Topeka, KS 66604
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee 301 North Main Suite 1150
Wichita, KS 67202


Docket last updated: 08/08/2024 12:06 AM CDT
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
crditcrd Wed 08/07 5:22 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )([LINK 24-21015 ) [misc,volp7cc] ( 338.00). Receipt number A19316607,amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card ) Wed 08/07 5:19 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Benefit Management, LLC Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due by 08/14/2024. (Nazar, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D)) Wed 08/07 5:23 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor Benefit Management, LLC Related [+]. (Nazar, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )
3 3 misc AAutoAsignJudge7B Wed 08/07 11:46 PM
Related: [-]