Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-02295
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 12:57 AM MST
Defendant
Josue Lopez-Chanax (1)
Represented By
Joseph Dimas Rueda, Jr.
Rueda Law Office PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Ruben Solis, Jr.
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/08/2024 2:42 AM MST
Friday, August 02, 2024
Arrest of Josue Lopez-Chanax on 8/2/2024. (CXE)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Josue Lopez-Chanax. (CXE)
Related: [-]