Bunting v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04345 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Northern, 1:24-cv-06204 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 5:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lakeland Industries Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Apparel Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Sales LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Narcote Holding Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Narcote LLC
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686 |
|
Defendant
TenCate Protective Fabrics USA
6501Mall Blvd.
Union City, GA 30291 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment Co
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment CO
|
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Holding Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Dan Bunting
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice Other
Thu 08/08 5:42 PM
NOTICE TO NEW COUNSEL ad hoc to Attorney Matthew T Jenkins: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. All counsel of record are directed to take the steps necessary to be registered as electronic filers in the District of South Carolina if not previously done so ( See CMO No. 3 pg. 17 Electronic Filing at 22. footnote 5 (ECF Multidistrict Litigation Attorney Registration Form - available at the link at the end of this NOTICE). Judge Gergel directs that CMO Nos. 1 - 30, (including any supplemental CMO Nos. i.e., 2.A, etc.) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed in the Lead case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. Please contact lead / liaison counsel before calling the Court (contact information available at the link at the end of this NOTICE). PLEASE also read CLERKS NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 and QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE (s) filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing : Next Monthly Status Conference will be In-Person (absent further Order from the Court) set for 9/13/2024 9:00 AM. The conference will be conducted in Charleston Courtroom #1, U. S. Court House, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) |
|
10 | 10
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 08/08 4:51 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Northern, 1:24-cv-06204, Bunting v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-4345-RMG (jbin) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 08/08 4:47 PM
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:24-cv-06204. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Not MDL
Thu 08/08 2:08 PM
TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court, South Carolina the electronic record. (jh, ) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order Terminate Civil Case
Thu 08/08 2:00 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to United States District Court of South Carolina. Civil case terminated pursuant to MDL 2873 Conditional Transfer Order dated 8/6/2024) Mailed notice(jh, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeremy C. Daniel: Status hearing set for 9/10/2024 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/8/2024.] | |
5 | 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (jj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/8/2024.] | |
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/8/2024.] | ||
MAILED copy of the Clerk's Notice along with the Joint Consent Form to Plaintiff's Counsel Matthew T. Jenkins. (jj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/8/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 3M Company by Daniel Leslie Ring (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/8/2024.] | |
3 | 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 3M Company (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/8/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/8/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, County Department, Law Division, case number (2024L007980) filed by 3M Company Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22273750.(Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/8/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint | ||
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jeremy C. Daniel. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (man, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/8/2024.] |