California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:24-cv-06730
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 1:55 AM PST
Defendant
Kanye West
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Yeezy LLC
Plaintiff
BackGrid London Ltd.
Represented By
Joanna Ardalan
One LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BackGrid USA, Inc.
Represented By
Joanna Ardalan
One LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 30, 2025
21 21 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Thu 01/30 11:33 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Yeezy, LLC, Kanye West. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
20 20 motion Clerk to Enter Default Wed 01/29 12:20 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Kanye West, Yeezy LLC filed by Plaintiffs BackGrid USA, Inc., BackGrid London Ltd.. (Ardalan, Joanna)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 01/27 9:25 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff to show cause, in writing, on or before February 10, 2025, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
18 18 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 12/03 12:26 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kanye West, upon Defendant Kanye West served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kanye West in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Ardalan, Joanna)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 12/03 12:22 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc., BackGrid London Ltd., upon Defendant Yeezy LLC served on 11/22/2024, answer due 12/13/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Elliott Brack - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Ardalan, Joanna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
16 16 service Summons Issued Thu 11/21 11:20 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition,13 as to Defendant Yeezy LLC. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
15 15 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Tue 11/19 10:05 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by BackGrid USA, Inc., BackGrid London Ltd..(Ardalan, Joanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A
14 14 notice Summons Request Tue 11/19 9:53 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,13 filed by Plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc., BackGrid London Ltd.. (Ardalan, Joanna)
Related: [-]
13 13 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Tue 11/19 9:50 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc., BackGrid London Ltd.(Ardalan, Joanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-2,
Att: 3 Exhibit B-1,
Att: 4 Exhibit B-2,
Att: 5 Exhibit C
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 11/06 2:59 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc., BackGrid London Ltd., upon Defendant Kanye West served on 10/10/2024, answer due 10/31/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon "Jane Doe" Related [+] - Front Desk Concierge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Ardalan, Joanna)
Related: [-] fused to Provide Name
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 08/14 1:48 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 08/12 12:06 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Kanye West. (lh)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 08/12 11:53 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 08/12 11:53 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 08/12 11:52 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
6 6 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Thu 08/08 3:20 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by BackGrid London Ltd., BackGrid USA, Inc..(Ardalan, Joanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 08/08 3:19 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Ardalan, Joanna)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/08 3:17 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs BackGrid London Ltd., BackGrid USA, Inc. (Ardalan, Joanna)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 08/08 3:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs BackGrid London Ltd., BackGrid USA, Inc.. (Ardalan, Joanna)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Thu 08/08 3:14 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff BackGrid London Ltd., BackGrid USA, Inc.. (Ardalan, Joanna)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/08 3:11 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37990326 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs BackGrid USA, Inc., BackGrid London Ltd.. (Attorney Joanna Ardalan added to party BackGrid London Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Joanna Ardalan added to party BackGrid USA, Inc.(pty:pla))(Ardalan, Joanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-2,
Att: 3 Exhibit B-1,
Att: 4 Exhibit B-2