California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:J Barrett Marum
Case #: 3:24-bk-03003
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Nov 21, 2024
Claims Deadline:Jan 02, 2025

Debtor
Tiny House Company, Inc
7040 Avenida Encinas # 104-753
Carlsbad, CA 92011-4652
Represented By
Scott R. Burton
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Leslie T. Gladstone
5656 La Jolla Blvd.,
La Jolla, CA 92037
Represented By
Christin A. Batt
Financial Law Group
contact info
United States Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 880 Front Street Suite 3230
San Diego, CA 92101


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 6:04 PM PDT
Friday, August 09, 2024
crditcrd Auto-docket of credit card Fri 08/09 10:29 AM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 24-03003 7] ) [misc,1027u] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 338.00 Receipt number A18154990 Related [+]; (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 38 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (fee) - case upload Fri 08/09 10:27 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals, Schedules A-J & Statement of Financial Affairs Fee Amount $ 338.00 filed by Scott R. Burton on behalf of Tiny House Company, Inc. Declaration re: Electronic Filing due by 8/23/2024, (Burton, Scott)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (CSD 1801) Fri 08/09 10:27 AM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Scott R. Burton on behalf of Tiny House Company, Inc. Related [+] (Burton, Scott)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition
3 3 1 pgs misc Corporate Ownership Statement (CSD 1007-7) Fri 08/09 10:28 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement as Corporate Debtor. filed by Scott R. Burton on behalf of Tiny House Company, Inc. (Burton, Scott)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs CASBApi CASB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (BUS) Fri 08/09 11:22 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of InterimTrustee Gladstone, Leslie T. 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/12/2024 at 09:30 AM at via Zoom - Gladstone Meeting ID 260 657 8691, and Passcode 7074482752, Phone (619) 367-1820. (Burton, Scott)
Related: [-]
5 5 BNC Court Certificate of Notice re Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] Notice Date 08/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case & Meeting of Creditors