Crystallex International Corp v. Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela, et al
Original Case: 1:17-mc-00151
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02463 |
Type | civil / private / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2024 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
IVAN FREITES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PDV HOLDING INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CITGO PETROLEUM CORP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BOLIVARIAN REPUBLIC OF VENEZUELA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CRYSTALLEX INTERNATIONAL CORP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 5:09 AM EDT |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ivan Freites in District Court No. 1-17-mc-00151. (TMM) | ||
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs caption | ||
Att: 3 3 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
1 pgs ORDER (Clerk) Many parties and non-parties have appeared in this district-court case over the past seven years. But only some of them participated in the motion proceedings that are at issue in this appeal. If other parties, who were not involved in the underlying motion proceedings, intend to participate in this appeal, they must notify this Court within fourteen days. Their failure to respond to this order will be deemed a notice of non-participation and they will not be permitted to file a brief. (TMM) | ||
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (TMM) |