Minnesota District Court
Judge:Donovan W Frank
Referred: Douglas L Micko
Case #: 0:24-cv-03241
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 3:23 AM CST
Defendant
Alex Neist
Represented By
Nathaniel John Ajouri
Maslon LLP
contact info
Jason A Lien
Maslon LLP
contact info
Terrance C Newby
Maslon LLP
contact info
Haley-Rose Cassidy Severson
Maslon LLP
contact info
Defendant
Neist Media LLC
Represented By
Nathaniel John Ajouri
Maslon LLP
contact info
Jason A Lien
Maslon LLP
contact info
Terrance C Newby
Maslon LLP
contact info
Haley-Rose Cassidy Severson
Maslon LLP
contact info
Defendant
Benjamin Read
Represented By
Nathaniel John Ajouri
Maslon LLP
contact info
Jason A Lien
Maslon LLP
contact info
Terrance C Newby
Maslon LLP
contact info
Haley-Rose Cassidy Severson
Maslon LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alex Hormozi
Represented By
Andrew Connors
Darkhorse Law PLLC
contact info
Benjamin J Hamborg
Henson & Efron, P.A.
contact info

GPO Nov 13 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Plaintiff Alex Hormozi's motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. No. 12) is DENIED. Defendants Neist Media LLC, Alex Neist, and Benjamin Read's motion to dismiss and motion to strike (Doc. No. 20) is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/13/2024. (las)

Docket last updated: 04/07/2025 8:01 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
49 49 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Tue 03/11 3:09 PM
ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 4/21/2025. Confidential Letters to Court due by 4/23/2025. Settlement Conference set for 4/30/2025 at 09:30 AM via Zoom Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. The parties can use the link below or go to Zoomgov.com and use the following login information to join the hearing: Meeting URL: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1612116817?pwd=ubeSZkDDWETyhnMqFkT4fxBS3BcAjv.1, Meeting ID: 161 211 6817, Passcode: 836421. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 3/11/2025. (jme)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
48 48 minutes Status Conference Fri 02/21 10:41 AM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 2/21/2025: Status Conference. No Digital Recording St. Paul Courthouse, Zoom Audio Conference Time: 9:59am-10:10am Total Time: 11 minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff: Andrew Connors; Benjamin Hamborg For Defendants: Terrance Newby PROCEEDINGS: Status conference held. Parties are directed to submit a joint email to Micko_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov no later than February 28, 2025, indicating their respective positions on whether and when a Court-facilitated settlement conference is most likely to be productive. (jme)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
47 47 order Protective Order Tue 01/14 11:15 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 1/14/2025. (jme)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
46 46 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Mon 01/13 1:52 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re45 Stipulation. (Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
45 45 misc Stipulation Mon 01/13 1:48 PM
STIPULATION Protective Order by Neist Media LLC, Alex Neist. Jointly Signed by Alex Hormozi, Neist Media LLC, Alex Neist, and Benjamin Read. (Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
44 44 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Wed 01/08 3:32 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE OF SCHEDULING: Status Conference set for 2/21/2025 at 10:00 AM via Zoom Audio-only Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. The parties can use the link below or go to Zoomgov.com and use the following login information to join the hearing: Meeting URL: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1603391275?pwd=va3UokbZakJxBUubqeOI7y9lkldJXx.1, Meeting ID: 160 339 1275, Passcode: 865505. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 1/8/2025. (jme)
Related: [-]
43 43 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Wed 01/08 2:03 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-3241 (DWF/DLM) . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/8/2025.(MKB)
Related: [-]
42 42 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/08 1:11 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/14/2025. Fact Discovery due by 9/30/2025. Motions (non-disp) due 9/30/2025. Motions (disp) due by 1/30/2026. Ready for trial due by 6/29/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/8/2025. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
41 41 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 01/07 11:47 AM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/7/2025: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference. No Digital Recording Minneapolis Courthouse, Courtroom 9E Time: 11:30a / 11:40a Total Time: 10 min APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Andrew Connors (by phone), Benjamin Hamborg For Defendant(s): Terrance Newby PROCEEDINGS: Discussion of Pretrial Deadlines. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
40 40 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 12/31 4:53 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Neist Media LLC, Alex Neist, Benjamin Read. Jointly Signed by Alex Hormozi.(Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
39 39 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Tue 11/26 3:44 PM
ORDER/NOTICE OF SCHEDULING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 12/30/2024. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/30/2024. Confidential Letters due 12/30/24. Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2025 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/26/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Friday, November 22, 2024
38 38 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/22 3:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Neist Media LLC, Alex Neist, Benjamin Read. (Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
37 37 20 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion to Dismiss/General Order on Motion to Strike Pleading Wed 11/13 3:36 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Plaintiff Alex Hormozi's motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. No.12 ) is DENIED. Defendants Neist Media LLC, Alex Neist, and Benjamin Read's motion to dismiss and motion to strike (Doc. No.20 ) is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/13/2024. (las)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
36 36 1 pgs minutes Motion Hearing Fri 10/25 1:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Motions Hearing held on 10/25/2024 re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No.12 ) and MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Strike Complaint (Doc. No.20 ). Matters taken under advisement; written order to issue. (Court Reporter Lynne Krenz). (ljl)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
35 35 14 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 10/18 5:59 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re20 MOTION to Dismiss/General and MOTION to Strike Pleading1 Complaint, - Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) and 12(f) Motions filed by Alex Neist, Neist Media LLC, Benjamin Read.(Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Thursday, October 17, 2024
34 34 misc Declaration Thu 10/17 4:37 PM
DECLARATION of Andrew Connors re33 Reply to Response to Motion by Alex Hormozi .(Hamborg, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Response to Rebuttal Report of Niall MacMenamin
33 33 13 pgs respm Reply Memorandum or Notice of No Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/17 4:34 PM
Reply to Response to Motion re12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alex Hormozi.(Hamborg, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Friday, October 04, 2024
32 32 17 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/04 3:49 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re20 MOTION to Dismiss/General and MOTION to Strike Pleading1 Complaint, - Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) and 12(f) Motions filed by Alex Hormozi.(Hamborg, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Thursday, October 03, 2024
31 31 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Thu 10/03 5:14 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alex Neist, Neist Media LLC, Benjamin Read.(Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/03 5:13 PM
DECLARATION of Benjamin Read in Opposition to12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alex Neist, Neist Media LLC, Benjamin Read.(Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/03 5:11 PM
DECLARATION of Terrance C. Newby in Opposition to12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alex Neist, Neist Media LLC, Benjamin Read.(Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
28 28 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/03 5:08 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alex Neist, Neist Media LLC, Benjamin Read.(Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 09/25 3:04 PM
ORDER - The Parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No.25 ) is APPROVED. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 9/25/2024.(las)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Wed 09/25 10:14 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re25 Stipulation. (Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Stipulation Wed 09/25 10:13 AM
STIPULATION re12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond by Alex Neist, Neist Media LLC, Benjamin Read. Jointly Signed by Alex Hormozi. (Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
24 24 misc Proposed Order to Judge - Other Fri 09/13 3:46 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) and 12(f) Motions20 Motion to Dismiss/General, Motion to Strike Pleading. (Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Meet and Confer Statement Fri 09/13 3:44 PM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re20 Motion to Dismiss/General, Motion to Strike Pleading filed by Alex Neist, Neist Media LLC, Benjamin Read.(Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
22 22 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 09/13 3:43 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re20 MOTION to Dismiss/General and MOTION to Strike Pleading1 Complaint, - Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) and 12(f) Motions filed by Alex Neist, Neist Media LLC, Benjamin Read.(Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Fri 09/13 3:39 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION20 MOTION to Dismiss/General and MOTION to Strike Pleading1 Complaint, - Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) and 12(f) Motions : Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs motion Dismiss/General Strike Pleading Fri 09/13 3:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss/General and , MOTION to Strike Pleading1 Complaint, - Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) and 12(f) Motions filed by Alex Neist, Neist Media LLC, Benjamin Read. (Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 09/10 1:33 PM
ORDER on17 Stipulation. Alex Neist answer due 9/13/2024; Neist Media LLC answer due 9/13/2024; Benjamin Read answer due 9/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/10/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
18 18 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Fri 09/06 12:36 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re17 Stipulation. (Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Stipulation Fri 09/06 12:35 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Alex Neist, Neist Media LLC, Benjamin Read. Jointly Signed by Alex Hormozi. (Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 09/05 12:42 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Hamborg, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Meet and Confer Statement Thu 09/05 12:40 PM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alex Hormozi.(Hamborg, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Thu 09/05 12:40 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alex Hormozi.(Hamborg, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
13 13 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 09/05 12:38 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alex Hormozi.(Hamborg, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
12 12 motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 09/05 12:37 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alex Hormozi. (Hamborg, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/28 8:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance C Newby on behalf of Alex Neist, Neist Media LLC, Benjamin Read. (Newby, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/23 9:22 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alex Hormozi. Benjamin Read served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. (Hamborg, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/20 10:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alex Hormozi. (Hamborg, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/20 9:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alex Hormozi. Neist Media LLC served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. (Hamborg, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/20 9:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alex Hormozi. Alex Neist served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. (Hamborg, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/19 9:59 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew Connors for Alex Hormozi. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/19/2024. (CNO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/13 9:58 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew P. Connors. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-11258865 filed by Alex Hormozi. (Hamborg, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
4 4 notice Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney Mon 08/12 4:24 PM
(Text-Only) Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Andrew P. Connors as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (MKB)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 08/12 4:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Alex Neist, Neist Media LLC, Benjamin Read. (MKB)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Mon 08/12 4:21 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-3241 (DWF/DTS). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/12 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11257808) filed by Alex Hormozi. Filer requests summons issued. (Hamborg, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) P1-P27,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet