Consolidated
Lead case: 1:23-md-03056

Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:24-cv-03526
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2024
Terminated:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 5:34 AM EST
Defendant
Overby-Seawell Company
Represented By
Benjamin Scott Dorfman
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker Llp -Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Fulton Financial Corporation
Represented By
Christopher A. Wiech
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Chelsea Morgan Lamb
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/28 5:16 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Reopen Case For Referral to Magistrate Judge For Settlement Conference filed by Overby-Seawell Company. (Sexton, Trace)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/28 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Trace Sexton on behalf of Overby-Seawell Company (Sexton, Trace)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
15 15 motion Reopen Case Mon 04/14 12:55 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case For Referral to Magistrate Judge For Settlement Conference with Brief In Support by Fulton Financial Corporation.(Wiech, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Wed 11/27 11:30 AM
ORDER: The parties have filed a Status Report in which they request a stay pending settlement discussions. (Doc.13 .) The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case for docket management purposes. Administrative closure will not prejudice the rights of the parties in any manner, nor preclude the filing of documents. If settlement fails, the parties need only file a motion to reopen this action. Absent an extension or further order of the Court, if there is no request to reopen within 90 days, the case may be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/27/2024. (tcc)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 11/27 11:32 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
13 13 misc Status Report Fri 11/22 3:57 PM
STATUS REPORT by Overby-Seawell Company. (Dorfman, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 11/06 2:41 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: Clerk's Notation re: ECFs10 and11 ; no conflicts identified. Approved by Judge Grimberg. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/04 7:07 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Overby-Seawell Company. (Dorfman, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/04 12:46 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fulton Financial Corporation. (Wiech, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Thu 10/31 11:45 AM
ORDER: The Court's Local Rules require a party to file, at the time of first appearance, a certificate of interested persons and a corporate disclosure statement. LR 3.3, NDGa. The parties have not complied with this requirement. The parties are accordingly ORDERED to file their certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement within three days of this Order. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/31/2024. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 09/23 1:29 PM
ORDER: The parties' Consent Motion to Stay ECF7 is GRANTED. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before November 22, 2024. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/23/2024. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
7 7 motion Stay Fri 09/20 1:51 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay by Overby-Seawell Company. (Dorfman, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 09/11 10:59 AM
ORDER: The parties' consent motion to extend the deadline to respond to the complaint ECF5 is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. The new deadline is September 20, 2024. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/11/2024. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time Fri 09/06 5:19 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Overby-Seawell Company. (Dorfman, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Mon 08/19 4:19 PM
Return of Service Executed by Fulton Financial Corporation. Overby-Seawell Company served on 8/16/2024, answer due 9/6/2024. (Wiech, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Tue 08/13 3:11 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/13/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 08/13 11:28 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Overby-Seawell Company. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 08/13 11:26 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Fulton Financial Corporation. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13633576) (pdt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet