Kansas District Court
Judge:Daniel D Crabtree
Referred: Brooks G Severson
Case #: 2:24-cv-02357
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Case in other court:District Court of Johnson County, KS, 24CV03694
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2025 2:42 AM CST
Defendant
Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By
Stacy Murrow Bunck
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, Pc - Kc
contact info
Jordan Kurdi
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, Pc - Kc
contact info
Plaintiff
Cordell Benton
Represented By
Tiffany B. Klosener
Holman Schiavone, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Honeywell International
Terminated: 09/26/2024
Represented By
Stacy Murrow Bunck
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, Pc - Kc
contact info
Jordan Kurdi
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, Pc - Kc
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
39 39 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Mon 04/28 1:54 PM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER:31 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order - GRANTED. Discovery deadline 6/17/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/11/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2025 at 11:00 AM in Telephone BGS - -CONFERENCE LINE: 1-316-402-0044 CONFERENCE ID: 485 069 538 before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. Dispositive motion deadline 8/22/2025. Jury Trial set for 5/5/2026 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 476 (DDC) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 4/28/2025. (msb)
Related: [-]
38 38 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 04/28 11:38 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson: MOTION HEARING held on 4/28/2025 re31 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Cordell Benton. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mmv)
Related: [-]
37 37 discov Amended Notice to Take Deposition Mon 04/28 10:24 AM
AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiff Cordell Benton of taking deposition of Steven Klossen on 06/12/2025 (Klosener, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
36 36 discov Amended Notice to Take Deposition Mon 04/28 10:23 AM
AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiff Cordell Benton of taking deposition of Megan Flax on 06/10/2025 (Klosener, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
35 35 discov Notice to Take Deposition Fri 04/25 2:12 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Cordell Benton of taking deposition of Todd Press on 06/17/2025 (Klosener, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
34 34 discov Notice to Take Deposition Fri 04/25 2:11 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Cordell Benton of taking deposition of Steven Klossen on 06/12/2025 (Klosener, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
33 33 discov Notice to Take Deposition Fri 04/25 2:10 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Cordell Benton of taking deposition of Megan Flax on 06/10/2025 (Klosener, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Wed 04/23 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING 31 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2025 at 11:00 AM by telephone (BGS -- CONFERENCE LINE: 1-316-402-0044 CONFERENCE ID: 485 069 538) before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. The parties are instructed to have a confirmed plan regarding witnesses to be deposed along with confirmed dates for those depositions . (df)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
31 31 motion Amend Scheduling Order Tue 04/22 3:33 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Cordell Benton Related [+] (Klosener, Tiffany)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson
Friday, February 28, 2025
30 30 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/28 2:38 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 5/2/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2025 at 10:00 AM by Telephone BGS - -CONFERENCE LINE: 1-316-402-0044 CONFERENCE ID: 485 069 538 before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. Dispositive motion deadline 7/11/2025. Jury Trial set for 4/7/2026 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 476 (DDC) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Estimated trial time 4 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 2/28/2025. (sz)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Fri 02/28 1:51 PM
ORDER granting, for good cause shown,28 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Amended Scheduling Order forthcoming. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 2/28/25. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Amend Scheduling Order Fri 02/28 11:17 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Cordell Benton Related [+](Klosener, Tiffany) Modified event and title on 2/28/2025 (ca)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson
Att: 1 Ex Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/25 5:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents by Honeywell International Inc.. (Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
26 26 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/23 10:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests to Defendant by Cordell Benton. (Klosener, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/21 3:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures by Cordell Benton. (Klosener, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/17 4:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures by Honeywell International Inc.. (Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
23 23 adr ADR Report Wed 12/11 12:36 PM
ADR REPORT by Honeywell International Inc.. ADR session held on: December 11, 2024 and conducted by Judge Jay Daugherty. Results of ADR: Case did not settle. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Partial Discovery(Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
22 22 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Mon 11/11 3:03 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to to Plaintiff's Petition and Affirmative Defenses by Honeywell International Inc.. (Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/23 5:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Response and Objections to RFP by Cordell Benton. (Klosener, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/23 5:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answers and Objections to Interrogatories by Cordell Benton. (Klosener, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
19 19 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 10/22 2:37 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Honeywell International Inc. of taking deposition of Cordell Benton on November 20, 2024 (Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
18 18 notice Joint Mediation Notice Fri 10/18 1:43 PM
JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held 12/11/2024 by Cordell Benton (Klosener, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order Fri 09/27 8:59 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time 4 Days. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 10/18/2024. Mediation deadline 1/31/2025. Discovery deadline 2/28/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/28/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2025 at 10:00 AM by Telephone (BGS - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. Dispositive motion deadline 5/9/2025. Jury Trial set for 1/6/2026 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 476 (DDC) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 9/26/2024. (jal)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Docket Text Modification Fri 09/27 9:14 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk regarding 16 Order: text of order corrected to remove comma between International and Inc.; correct party is "Honeywell International Inc.". (heo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
16 16 order Order on Motion for Order Thu 09/26 4:15 PM
ORDER granting, for good cause shown and as unopposed, 15 Motion for Order to correct case caption. The Clerk is directed to change the name of Defendant from "Honeywell International" to "Honeywell International, Inc." Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 9/26/24. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Order Thu 09/26 4:13 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Order correcting case caption by Defendant Honeywell International (raised orally at 9/26/24 scheduling conference). Related [+] (df)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson
14 14 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 09/26 2:33 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 9/26/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/16 4:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Disclosures by Cordell Benton. (Klosener, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/16 12:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Disclosures by Honeywell International. (Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
11 11 order Protective Order Mon 09/09 9:32 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 9/9/24. (df)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 09/09 9:31 AM
ORDER granting, for good cause shown,8 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 9/9/24. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/03 5:29 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Interrogatories and First Request for Production by Honeywell International. (Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Protective Order Tue 09/03 3:18 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Honeywell International Related [+] (Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson
Monday, August 26, 2024
7 7 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 08/26 5:20 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Kurdi on behalf of Honeywell International (Kurdi, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
6 6 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Thu 08/15 10:36 AM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2024 at 02:00 PM by Telephone BGS - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703 before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 9/5/2024. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 9/16/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 9/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 08/15/24. (cc)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/15 9:50 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Honeywell International identifying none as corporate parent (Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/15 9:48 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Honeywell International.(Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 08/15 8:38 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
3 3 misc Designation of Place of Trial Wed 08/14 4:44 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Honeywell International - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 08/14 4:39 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Honeywell International. (Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 08/14 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, KS, case number 24CV03694 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6441902.), filed by Honeywell International.(Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Court File,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Klax Declaration