New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Edward R Korman
Case #: 1:24-cv-05733
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2024
Terminated:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 12, 2025 3:42 AM EST
Defendant
Director Ur M Jaddou
U.S.C.I.S. 111 Massachusetts Street NW
Washington, DC 20529
Represented By
Mary M. Dickman
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Department of Homeland Security 2707 Martin Luther King Jr Ave S MS 0525
Washington, DC 20528
Represented By
Mary M. Dickman
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Lixia Chen
Represented By
Stuart Mitchell Altman
Law Office Of Stuart Altman
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Tue 09/17 1:05 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry6 . Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 9/17/2024. (MO)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 09/16 12:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Against Refiling by Ur M Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas (Dickman, Mary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Immigration/Social Security Cases Thu 08/22 8:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary M. Dickman on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Dickman, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Mon 08/19 4:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lixia Chen. Ur M Jaddou served on 8/19/2024, answer due 10/18/2024; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 8/19/2024, answer due 10/18/2024. (Altman, Stuart)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 08/19 8:38 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 08/19 8:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Ur M Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 08/19 8:36 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Edward R. Korman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/16 12:53 PM
COMPLAINT Lixia Chen against Ur M Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18185467 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Lixia Chen. (Altman, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit I-751 Receipt