Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-40469

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Elizabeth D Katz
Case #: 4:24-ap-04033
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2024
Terminated:Nov 01, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michael F. Hodgman
6 Paul Street
Auburn, MA 01501
Represented By
Troy D. Morrison
Morrison & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Accumet Engineering, Inc.
41 Lake George Street
Devens, MA 01434
Represented By
Tiffany Stichel
Schlossberg, LLC
contact info
Lisa Treiber
Schlossberg, LLC
contact info
Tiffany L. Stichel
Schlossberg, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, November 01, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Fri 11/01 8:44 AM
Adversary Case 4:24-ap-4033 Closed. (ag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 10/17 9:08 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 24-4033 Dismissed Complaint. (ag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 08/22 3:11 PM
Summons Service Executed on Michael F. Hodgman 8/22/2024 (Stichel, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/16 9:14 AM
Summons Issued on Michael F. Hodgman. Answer Due 9/16/2024. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (ag)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/16 9:09 AM
Adversary case 24-04033 Complaint by Accumet Engineering, Inc., Michael F. Hodgman against Michael F. Hodgman. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury))(Stichel, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3