ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD. v. PDD HOLDINGS INC. et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Kelly |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02402 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2024 4:14 PM EDT |
Defendant
DOES 1-20
|
|
Defendant
PDD HOLDINGS INC.
|
|
Defendant
WHALECO, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD.
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 09/09 10:11 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting the parties'21 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that the parties'21 joint motion is GRANTED, and Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by October 16, 2024. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/9/2024. (lctjk1) |
||
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 09/06 4:26 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint by PDD HOLDINGS INC., WHALECO, INC..(Naydonov, Anna) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/06 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Songer on behalf of PDD HOLDINGS INC., WHALECO, INC. (Songer, Michael) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/06 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Naydonov on behalf of PDD HOLDINGS INC., WHALECO, INC. (Naydonov, Anna) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Fri 09/06 12:36 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PDD HOLDINGS INC. served on 8/26/2024, answer due 9/16/2024 (Burck, William) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/05 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Teruya on behalf of ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD. (Teruya, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/03 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Quinn on behalf of ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD. (Quinn, John) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/30 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew H. Schapiro on behalf of ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD. (Schapiro, Andrew) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/30 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ernest Williams on behalf of ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD. (Williams, Michael) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Thu 08/22 6:58 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WHALECO, INC. served on 8/22/2024, answer due 9/12/2024 (Burck, William) |
|
12 | 12
order
.Order
Thu 08/22 10:11 AM
STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/22/2024. (lctjk1) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/22 9:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's7 ,9 ,10 ,11 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Michael E. Williams, John B. Quinn, Andrew Schapiro, and Kevin Y. Teruya are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/22/2024. (lctjk1) |
||
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/21 3:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kevin Y. Teruya, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11107737. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD..(Burck, William) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/21 3:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrew Schapiro, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11107704. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD..(Burck, William) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/21 3:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John B. Quinn, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11107582. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD..(Burck, William) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 08/21 12:20 PM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to PDD HOLDINGS INC., WHALECO, INC..(znmw) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 08/21 12:17 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (znmw) |
||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/20 5:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael E. Williams, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number CDCDC-11104746. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD..(Burck, William) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
misc
Errata
Tue 08/20 3:38 PM
ERRATA by ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD..(Burck, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
notice
Notice of Error- New Case
Tue 08/20 9:20 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,,. The following error(s) need correction: Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file a Notice of Errata stating the error and attach the corrected initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party and file using the event Errata. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmw) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/19 5:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Domenic Bonanno on behalf of ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD. (Bonanno, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/19 5:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Burck on behalf of ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD. (Burck, William) |
|
3 | 3
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Mon 08/19 5:19 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD. (Burck, William) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Related Case
Mon 08/19 5:02 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD.. Case related to Case No. 23cv03706 (Burck, William) |
|
1 | 1
80
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/19 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT against DOES 1-20, PDD HOLDINGS INC., WHALECO, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number CDCDC-11101576) filed by ROADGET BUSINESS PTE. LTD..(Burck, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 20, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 21, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 22, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 23, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 24, | ||
Att: 25 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 26 Summons PDD HOLDINGS INC., | ||
Att: 27 Summons WHALECO, INC. |