California Central District Court
Judge:Consuelo B Marshall
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:24-cv-07032
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 15, 2025 12:25 AM PST
Defendant
City of Los Angeles
Represented By
Brian Levine
Los Angeles City Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Jessica Lee
Represented By
David P Myers
Myers Law Group Apc
contact info
Andriana Nicole Bravo
The Myers Law Group, Apc
contact info
Jason T. Hatcher
Myers Law Group Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, December 27, 2024
16 16 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Mon 12/30 9:09 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/27/2025. (shb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
15 15 adr Request for ADR Procedure No. 3 - (ADR-1) Tue 12/17 5:44 PM
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Plaintiff Jessica Lee(Hatcher, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
14 14 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 12/09 3:43 PM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court has reviewed the joint status report and orders the Scheduling Conference. currently set for December 19, 2024, is hereby taken off calendar. The Court will set the following deadlines: ADR-1 Form shall be filed on or before December 10, 2024, is hereby taken off calendar. The Court will set the following deadlines: ADR-1 Form shall be filed on or before December 17, 2025. Fact discovery shall be completed on or before April 1, 2025. Initial Expert disclosure due no later than September 1, 2025. Rebuttal expert disclosure shall be completed on or before October 1, 2025. Expert discovery shall be completed on or before October 15, 2025. Settlement Conference shall be held on or before October 30, 2025. Motions shall be set for oral argument January 20, 2026 at 10:00 a.m., Pre-Trial Conference is set on March 17, 2025 at 2:30 p.m., Jury trial is set on April 14, 2025 at 10:00 a,m, (est. 14 days). (shb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
13 13 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 12/03 9:06 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 14 days, filed by Plaintiff Jessica Lee.. (Hatcher, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held Tue 10/29 4:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (ys)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 09/10 10:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles.(Levine, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/04 4:33 PM
Notice DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES NOTICE OF INITIAL STANDING ORDER filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Levine, Brian)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 09/04 1:52 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. See order for details. (ys)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
8 8 order Transfer DECLINED-(related case)(CV-34) Wed 09/04 9:57 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related [+] filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:23-cv-04549 SVW(MARx) (rn)
Related: [-] lated Case
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
7 7 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 08/27 3:57 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to City of Los Angeles answer now due 9/10/2024, filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles.(Levine, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 08/20 9:45 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 08/20 9:45 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
4 4 notice Related Case(s) Mon 08/19 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Los Angeles City Attorney's Office. (Levine, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 08/19 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Los Angeles City Attorney's Office, (Levine, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 08/19 5:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Los Angeles City Attorney's Office. (Levine, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 08/19 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, case number 24STCV16517 Receipt No: ACACDC-38053496 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Los Angeles City Attorney's Office. (Attorney Brian Levine added to party Los Angeles City Attorney's Office(pty:dft))(Levine, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 15 pgs Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Notice of Case Assignment,
Att: 5 Initial Status Conference Order,
Att: 6 ADR,
Att: 7 Proof of Service of Summons,
Att: 8 Notice of Removal
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 08/20 9:39 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jessica Lee in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/2/2024, attached as Exhibit 2. (jtil)
Related: [-]