Callicut v. Harvey et al
Mississippi Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael P Mills |
Referred: | Jane M Virden |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00244 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1364 Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Aug 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Middle, 1:23-cv-00121 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 20, 2024 9:11 PM CDT |
Cross Claimant
Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Douglas L. Harvey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Douglas L. Harvey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessie E. Callicut
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 09/10 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel James Hammett on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Associated Cases: 3:24-cv-00003-MPM-JMV, 3:24-cv-00244-MPM-JMV (Hammett, Daniel) |
|
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 09/10 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregg A. Caraway on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Associated Cases: 3:24-cv-00003-MPM-JMV, 3:24-cv-00244-MPM-JMV (Caraway, Gregg) |
|
38 | 38
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 09/10 10:52 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Jury Demand, filed by Jessie E. Callicut.Associated Cases: 3:24-cv-00003-MPM-JMV, 3:24-cv-00244-MPM-JMV (Germany, Robert) |
|
notice
Notice of Correction
Tue 09/10 10:42 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re (36 in 3:24-cv-00244-MPM-JMV, 36 in 3:24-cv-00003-MPM-JMV) Amended Complaint: Attorney directed to refile with current parties listed in case style. Associated Cases: 3:24-cv-00003-MPM-JMV, 3:24-cv-00244-MPM-JMV (jla) |
||
Sunday, September 08, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice (Other)
Sun 09/08 10:05 AM
NOTICE by Robert G. Germany, Sr on behalf of Jessie E. Callicut Notice of Representation Associated Cases: 3:24-cv-00003-MPM-JMV, 3:24-cv-00244-MPM-JMV (Germany, Robert) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 09/06 2:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Jury Demand, filed by Jessie E. Callicut.Associated Cases: 3:24-cv-00003-MPM-JMV, 3:24-cv-00244-MPM-JMV (Germany, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 09/04 1:55 PM
ORDER granting (15) Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint in case 3:24-cv-00244-MPM-JMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/4/2024. Associated Cases: 3:24-cv-00244-MPM-JMV, 3:24-cv-00003-MPM-JMV (jwr) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Conference
Tue 08/27 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 9/10/2024. Associated Cases: 3:24-cv-00003-MPM-JMV, 3:24-cv-00244-MPM-JMV (irw) |
|
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order Lifting Stay
Tue 08/27 11:23 AM
ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/27/2024. Associated Cases: 3:24-cv-00003-MPM-JMV, 3:24-cv-00244-MPM-JMV (jla) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Mon 08/26 2:31 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/26/2024. Associated Cases: 3:24-cv-00244-MPM-JMV, 3:24-cv-00003-MPM-JMV (jtm) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Consolidate Cases
Fri 08/23 2:14 PM
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Jessie E. Callicut. (Germany, Robert) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 08/22 11:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/22/2024. (irw) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 08/20 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Pacific Blake on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Blake, Paul) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Conference
Tue 08/20 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/22/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (bbf) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Clerk's Notice of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted
Mon 08/19 11:02 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted to Practice Re: Mark A. Tate, Matthew Francis Branch, Ashley Scruggs Howard (jla) |
|
26 | 26
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 08/19 10:42 AM
|
|
notice
Notice of Assignment
Mon 08/19 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla) |
||
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
25 | 25 ORDER granting21 Motion to Sever; granting21 Motion to Transfer Case. As to Plaintiffs Claims Against SafeCo Insurance Company of Illinois, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to transfer this action, including all orders, motions, affidavits, pleadings, and exhibits filed herein, to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 08/16/2024. (mdm) | |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
24 | 24 REPLY to Response filed by JESSIE E CALLICUT re21 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case (GERMANY, ROBERT) | |
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
23 | 23 RESPONSE filed by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS re21 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case (HOWARD, ASHLEY) | |
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
22 | 22 7 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support filed by JESSIE E CALLICUT re:21 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case (GERMANY, ROBERT) | |
21 | 21 MOTION to Sever , MOTION to Transfer Case(, ) by JESSIE E CALLICUT filed by ROBERT GERMANY, SR.(GERMANY, ROBERT) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Georgia Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Mississippi Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Judicial Case Load Statistics | ||
Notice of Deficiency ; Other: Supporting documents should be filed as an attachment to the pleading. Do not refile - for future reference only. (mdm) | ||
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
Notice of Deficiency ; Document does NOT have to be re-filed, but all future filings with attachments must include a description of attachment(s). A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. An example of a properly identified attachment would be Exhibit A Letter from A. Hamilton to A. Burr. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures.(mdm) | ||
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
20 | 20 REPLY to Response filed by JESSIE E CALLICUT re15 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint,(GERMANY, ROBERT) Modified on 2/5/2024 to enter description for exhibits. (mdm) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Safeco Disclosures, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Correspondence from Germany dated 02/24/22, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Correspondence from Glines dated 02/24/22 | ||
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
19 | 19 RESPONSE filed by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS re15 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint,(HOWARD, ASHLEY) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Safeco Supplemental Disclosures | ||
Wednesday, December 27, 2023 | ||
18 | 18 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE re17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to15 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 12/27/23 (ab) | |
Friday, December 22, 2023 | ||
17 | 17 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to15 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS filed by ASHLEY SCRUGGS HOWARD.(HOWARD, ASHLEY) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Answer Motion | ||
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
Notice of Deficiency ; Other: Supporting documents should be filed as an attachment to the pleading. Do not refile - for future reference only.(mdm) | ||
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
16 | 16 4 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support filed by JESSIE E CALLICUT re:15 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, (GERMANY, ROBERT) | |
15 | 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, by JESSIE E CALLICUT filed by ROBERT GERMANY, SR.(GERMANY, ROBERT) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint | ||
Tuesday, November 07, 2023 | ||
14 | 14 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ROBERT GERMANY, SR. (mdm) | |
Monday, November 06, 2023 | ||
13 | 13 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of JESSIE E CALLICUT Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4498336, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Mark A. Tate #698820.(GERMANY, ROBERT) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
12 | 12 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER :Discovery to be complete by 4/4/2024. Dispositive motions due by 5/6/2024. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 10/10/2023.(bcl) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
11 | 11 RULES 16/26 ORDER :Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/10/2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 9/8/2023.(fad) | |
Att: 1 Required Form | ||
10 | 10 Jurisdictional Statement by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS (HOWARD, ASHLEY) | |
Tuesday, September 05, 2023 | ||
Notice of Deficiency ; In diversity cases, a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties. Please file the required statement immediately. See Local Rule 87.2.(mdm) | ||
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Safeco Corporation, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Other Affiliate Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY INC., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Other Affiliate SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, Other Affiliate LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY for SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. (HOWARD, ASHLEY) | |
Notice of Deficiency ; Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. These must be added within CM/ECF while the document is being filed. Notice of Deficiency In diversity cases, a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties. Please file the required statement immediately. See Local Rule 87.2.(mdm) | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding, Inc. for SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. (HOWARD, ASHLEY) | |
7 | 7 ANSWER to1 Complaint, (), CROSSCLAIM against DOUGLAS L HARVEY by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS with Jury Demand.(HOWARD, ASHLEY)Attorney ASHLEY SCRUGGS HOWARD added to party SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS(pty:dft) | |
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JESSIE E CALLICUT as to SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. (TATE, MARK) | |
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 ANSWER to1 Complaint, by DOUGLAS L HARVEY.(BRANCH, MATTHEW)Attorney MATTHEW FRANCIS BRANCH added to party DOUGLAS L HARVEY(pty:dft) | |
Friday, August 11, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JESSIE E CALLICUT as to SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. (TATE, MARK) | |
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JESSIE E CALLICUT as to DOUGLAS L HARVEY. (TATE, MARK) | |
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to DOUGLAS L HARVEY, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS.(mdm) | |
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Notice of Deficiency ATTORNEY CASE OPENING: Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(mdm) | ||
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4425546, $402 filed by Jessie E Callicut(TATE, MARK) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 8/19/2024.] (Attachment 1, 2, and 3 replaced on 8/19/2024 with flattened pdf versions of same) (jla) | |
Att: 1 Summons Safeco, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Harvey, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover |