AGTexas Farm Credit Services et al v. Rabo AgriFinance, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-20084
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-20084
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert L Jones |
Case #: | 2:24-ap-02007 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
3rd Pty Defendant
Rabo AgriFinance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross-Claimant
Rabo AgriFinance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angela Robinson
McWhorter, Cobb & Johnson, LLP P.O. Box 2547
Lubbock, TX 79408 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Meagan Goad
P.O. Box 1738
Lubbock, TX 79408 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shawn Ragland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rebecca Robinson
9397 CR 3114
Snyder, TX 79549 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Terry Robinson
9397 CR 3114
Snyder, TX 79549 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
2B Farms, a General Texas Partnership
9397 CR 3114
Snyder, TX 79549 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mechanics Bank
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rabo AgriFinance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Scarlet and Black Cattle, LLC
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Joel Brookshire
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Douglas Finley
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Gene Brookshire Family, LP
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Bryan Blackman
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Gary Lesh
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Steve T Scott Farm, Inc.
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Scott Livestock Company, Inc.
|
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Arnold Braun Trust
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Robert Braun
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Jim Rininger
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Robert Spring
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Michael Evans
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Miranda Evans
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Charles Lockwood
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Cole Lockwood
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Sherle Lockwood
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Nikki Lockwood
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Lyndal Van Buskirk
|
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Janet Van Buskirk
|
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Colby Van Buskirk
|
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Susan Van Buskirk
|
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Jimmy Greer
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Dustin Johnson
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Dora Blackman
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Ronnie Gray
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Jared Lesh
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Edward Dufurrena
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Open A Arena LLC
|
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Dennis Buss
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Buss Family Trust
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Eddie Bryant
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Robert E Gray
1936 Southside Terrace
Dallas, TX 75232 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Gray Brothers
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Craig Sutton
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Amy Sutton
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Steve Ryan
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Janice Lawhon
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
AJ Jacques Living Trust
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Gungoll Cattle, LLC
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Leah Gungoll
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Morrison Cafe, LLC
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Jan Lesh
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Lesh Family Trust
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff
Jordan Lesh, LLC
PO Box 15008
Amarillo, TX 79105 |
|
Plaintiff
HTLF Bank, Successor-in-Interest to First Bank & Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
First Bank & Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thorlakson Diamond T Feeders, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AgTexas PCA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AGTexas Farm Credit Services
|
Represented By
|
Trustee
Kent Ries (Trustee)
Attn: Hudson M. Jobe 2001 Bryan Street Suite 1800
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document
Thu 08/29 11:22 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/29/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Set or continue hearing
Tue 08/27 3:38 PM
Order setting hearing . Status Conference to be held on 12/12/2024 at 01:30 PM Amarillo, (VIDEO)via WebEx. Entered on 8/27/2024 (Kerr, S.) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document
Wed 08/21 11:09 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate (generic)
Tue 08/20 6:04 PM
Certificate of Service of First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Thorlakson and AgTexas filed by Defendant Rabo AgriFinance, LLC, 3rd Pty Defendant Rabo AgriFinance, LLC, Cross-Claimant Rabo AgriFinance, LLC. (Johnson, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate (generic)
Tue 08/20 6:03 PM
Certificate of Service of First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to 2B Parties filed by Defendant Rabo AgriFinance, LLC, 3rd Pty Defendant Rabo AgriFinance, LLC, Cross-Claimant Rabo AgriFinance, LLC. (Johnson, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate (generic)
Tue 08/20 6:01 PM
Certificate of Service of First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Defendant Rabo AgriFinance, LLC, 3rd Pty Defendant Rabo AgriFinance, LLC, Cross-Claimant Rabo AgriFinance, LLC. (Johnson, Michael) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
15
pgs
order
Order (generic)
Mon 08/19 5:09 PM
Order abating adversary. The proceedings in the consolidated adversary case, save for discovery, are stayed for 120 days from the entry of this order. . Entered on 8/19/2024 (Kerr, S.) Modified text on 8/20/2024 (Hyden, Kara) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/19 4:11 PM
Adversary case 24-02007 Order (1) granting Trustee's motions to consolidate and to abate; (2) denying Trustee's motion to intervene and to enforce stay; and (3) denying AgTexas's motion for remand. This order consolidates two adversary cases 24-02002 and 23-05002 AGTexas Farm Credit Services , AgTexas PCA , Thorlakson Diamond T Feeders, LP , Edward Dufurrena against Rabo AgriFinance, LLC . . Nature(s) of suit: 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (Kerr, S.) |