Craig Woodard v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04555 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 20, 2024 4:15 PM EDT |
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc.
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufactoring Company LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Craig Woodard
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 08/20 3:24 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 08/20/2024), Craig Woodard v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04555-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern District of Alabama (wmil) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/20 3:23 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil) |
|
1 | 1
55
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/20 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11944226.), filed by Craig Woodard. Service due by 11/18/2024 (wmil) |