Deanna Kochan v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04540 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 21, 2024 5:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Deanna Kochan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 08/20 1:09 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 08/19/2024), Deanna Kochan v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04540-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern District of Michigan (wmil) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/20 1:08 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
55
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/20 1:06 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11942904.), filed by Deanna Kochan. Service due by 11/18/2024 (wmil) |