Wagner v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04575 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 21, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Northern, 1:24-cv-06128 |
Last checked: Friday Aug 23, 2024 8:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lakeland Industries Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Apparel Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Sales LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Narcote Holding Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Narcote LLC
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
TenCate Protective Fabrics USA
6501Mall Blvd.
Union City, GA 30291 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment Co
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Protection Co.
|
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours & Co
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Holding Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Gayle Wagner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
17 | 17
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/27 10:38 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gayle Wagner on all defendants(Lumb, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service on defendant AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service on defendant Allstar Fire Equipment Co., | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service on defendant Amerex Corporation, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service on defendant Archroma U.S., Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service on defendant Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service on defendant Carrier Global Corporation, | ||
Att: 7 Certificate of Service on defendant CB Garment, Inc., d/b/a Crewboss, | ||
Att: 8 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemguard, Inc., | ||
Att: 9 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemicals, Inc., | ||
Att: 10 Certificate of Service on defendant Clariant Corporation, | ||
Att: 11 Certificate of Service on defendant Corveta, Inc., | ||
Att: 12 Certificate of Service on defendant Daikin America, Inc., | ||
Att: 13 Certificate of Service on defendant Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., | ||
Att: 14 Certificate of Service on defendant Dynax Corporation, | ||
Att: 15 Certificate of Service on defendant E.I. Du Pont de Nemours & Co., Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, | ||
Att: 16 Certificate of Service on defendant Fire Service Plus, Inc., | ||
Att: 17 Certificate of Service on defendant Fire-Dex, LLC, | ||
Att: 18 Certificate of Service on defendant Globe Holding Company, LLC, | ||
Att: 19 Certificate of Service on defendant Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, | ||
Att: 20 Certificate of Service on defendant Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 21 Certificate of Service on defendant Innotex Corporation, | ||
Att: 22 Certificate of Service on defendant Johnson Controls, Inc., | ||
Att: 23 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., (f/k/a Chubb National Foam, Inc., f/k/a National Foam, Inc.), | ||
Att: 24 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., (f/k/a Fenwal, Inc), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc., | ||
Att: 25 Certificate of Service on defendant Lakeland Industries, Inc., | ||
Att: 26 Certificate of Service on defendant Lion Apparel, Inc., | ||
Att: 27 Certificate of Service on defendant Lion Group, Inc., | ||
Att: 28 Certificate of Service on defendant L.N. Curtis & Sons, | ||
Att: 29 Certificate of Service on defendant Mallory Safety and Supply, LLC, | ||
Att: 30 Certificate of Service on defendant Milliken & Company, | ||
Att: 31 Certificate of Service on defendant Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, | ||
Att: 32 Certificate of Service on defendant MSA Safety Incorporated, | ||
Att: 33 Certificate of Service on defendant MSA Safety Sales, LLC, | ||
Att: 34 Certificate of Service on defendant Municipal Emergency Services, Inc., | ||
Att: 35 Certificate of Service on defendant Narcote Holding Corporation (f/k/a Stedfast, Inc., and/or Stedfast USA, Inc.), | ||
Att: 36 Certificate of Service on defendant Narcote, LLC (f/k/a Stedfast, Inc., and/or Stedfast USA, Inc.), | ||
Att: 37 Certificate of Service on defendant Nation Ford Chemical Company, | ||
Att: 38 Certificate of Service on defendant National Foam, Inc., | ||
Att: 39 Certificate of Service on defendant PBI Performance Products, Inc., | ||
Att: 40 Certificate of Service on defendant Perimeter Solutions, LP, | ||
Att: 41 Certificate of Service on defendant Ricochet Manufacturing Co., Inc., | ||
Att: 42 Certificate of Service on defendant Safety Components Fabric Technologies, Inc., | ||
Att: 43 Certificate of Service on defendant Stedfast USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 44 Certificate of Service on defendant Tencate Protective Fabrics USA, d/b/a Southern Mills, Inc., | ||
Att: 45 Certificate of Service on defendant The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, | ||
Att: 46 Certificate of Service on defendant The Chemours Company, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, | ||
Att: 47 Certificate of Service on defendant Tyco Fire Products, L.P. as Successor-In-Interest to The Ansul Company, | ||
Att: 48 Certificate of Service on defendant United Technologies Corporation, | ||
Att: 49 Certificate of Service on defendant UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (f/k/a GE Interlogix, Inc.), Individually as as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc., | ||
Att: 50 Certificate of Service on defendant Veridian Limited d/b/a Veridian Fire Protective Gear, | ||
Att: 51 Certificate of Service on defendant Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc., d/b/a "The Fire Store", | ||
Att: 52 Certificate of Service on defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc., | ||
Att: 53 Certificate of Service on defendant Arkema, Inc., | ||
Att: 54 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemdesign Products, Inc., | ||
Att: 55 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde PLC, Inc., (f/k/a Williams US Inc., f/k/a Williams Holdins, Inc.), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc. | ||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/22 12:13 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
15 | 15
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 08/22 11:12 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Northern, 1:24-cv-06128, Wagner v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04575 (jbin) |
|
14 | 14
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 08/22 10:54 AM
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:24-cv-06128. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
13 | 13 TRANSFERRED to the USDC of South Carolina the electronic record. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
11 | 11 MINUTE entry before the Executive Committee: Case reassigned to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule IOP 13(f)(1). Mailed notice (nsf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Request for Reassignment | ||
10 | 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gayle Wagner by Kenneth Thomas Lumb (Lumb, Kenneth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | |
9 | 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings: The Court hereby recuses itself from this case pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §455(b)(4). Reassignment order to follow. Judge Jeffrey I. Cummings no longer assigned to the case. Mailed notice (cc, )[Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
12 | 12 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to USDC South Carolina. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | |
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2873 Conditional Transfer Order filed 08/08/2024. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gayle Wagner by William T Gibbs (Gibbs, William) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | |
7 | 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gayle Wagner by Mitchell Wald Bild (Bild, Mitchell) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | |
6 | 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gayle Wagner by Kenneth Thomas Lumb (Lumb, Kenneth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | |
5 | 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | |
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (bi, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 3M Company by Daniel Leslie Ring (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | |
3 | 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 3M Company (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2024L007802) filed by 3M Company Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22265343.(Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/22/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Complaint |