Thompson v. Pioneer Bank & Trust
South Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Roberto A Lange |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-05067 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Aug 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 26, 2024 6:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
Pioneer Bank & Trust
|
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Taylor Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Affidavit
Tue 09/10 11:18 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Dylan Clarkson re3 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Bogard, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Signed Retention Agreement 2018 - November 5 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Brief
Tue 09/10 11:17 AM
BRIEF by Defendant Pioneer Bank & Trust re3 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction (Bogard, Heather) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 09/10 11:15 AM
MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Pioneer Bank & Trust. (Bogard, Heather) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 08/26 5:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Pioneer Bank & Trust. 1 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. (JLS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)
Mon 08/26 5:39 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4355716, in shell case on 8/26/2024 filed by Andrew Taylor Thompson. (JLS) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Salary Continuation Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Resignation |