Redline Metals, Inc.
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jacqueline P Cox |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-12590 |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Redline Metals, Inc.
930 North DuPage
Lombard, IL 60148 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago |
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Appearance
Wed 09/18 11:22 AM
Appearance Filed by Scott N. Schreiber on behalf of Silgan Containers LLC. (Schreiber, Scott) |
|
41 | 41
misc
Appearance
Wed 09/18 11:18 AM
Appearance Filed by Joseph Allen Archambeau on behalf of Silgan Containers LLC. (Archambeau, Joseph) |
|
40 | 40
notice
Appointment of Unsecured Creditor's Committee
Wed 09/18 10:10 AM
Notice of Appointment of Unsecured Creditor's Committee Filed by U.S. Trustee Patrick S Layng. (Ramirez, Suhey) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Employ
Tue 09/17 5:25 PM
Notice of Motion and Application to Employ Paul M. Bach and Penelope N. Bach of Bach Law Offices, Inc. as Attorney for Debtor/Debtor in Possession Filed by Paul M. Bach on behalf of Redline Metals, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 9/24/2024 at 01:00 PM at Appear In Courtroom 680, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cox. (Bach, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Declarations of Paul M. Bach and Penelope N. Bach | ||
Att: 3 Proof of Service | ||
38 | 38
motion
Set Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim
Tue 09/17 5:23 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Set Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim Filed by Paul M. Bach on behalf of Redline Metals, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 9/24/2024 at 01:00 PM at Appear In Courtroom 680, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cox. (Bach, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
37 | 37
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Tue 09/17 4:22 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . hearing scheduled for 09/24/2024 at 01:30 PM at Appear in Courtroom 680, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cox. (Green, Josephine) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Joinder
Mon 09/16 5:01 PM
Joinder Filed by John R O'Connor on behalf of KKSP Precision Machining, LLC . (O'Connor, John) |
|
35 | 35
answer
Response
Mon 09/16 2:33 PM
Response to Filed by Lina Toma on behalf of Old Second National Bank (Toma, Lina) |
|
34 | 34
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 09/16 11:53 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Craig E. Stevenson on behalf of Panzerz Recycling Co. LLC. (Stevenson, Craig) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 09/16 11:40 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Craig E. Stevenson on behalf of B&B Metals Processing Co., Inc.. (Stevenson, Craig) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Appearance
Wed 09/11 10:11 AM
Appearance Filed by Lars A Peterson on behalf of MacLean - Fogg Component Solutions LLC. (Peterson, Lars) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
order
Use Cash Collateral
Wed 09/11 6:21 AM
Second Interim Order Granting in Part, Continuing Motion To Use Cash Collateral . Hearing scheduled for 9/24/2024 at 01:30 PM at Appear In Courtroom 680, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cox. Signed on 9/10/2024. (Batson, Nicole) |
|
30 | 30
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Tue 09/10 10:03 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . hearing scheduled for 09/17/2024 at 01:30 PM at Appear in Courtroom 680, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cox. (Green, Josephine) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Extend Time to File Schedules or Provide Required Information
Tue 09/10 9:05 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Paul M. Bach on behalf of Redline Metals, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 9/24/2024 at 01:00 PM at Appear In Courtroom 680, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cox. (Bach, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
28 | 28
misc
Proposed Order
Tue 09/10 9:10 AM
Proposed Order - SECOND INTERIM ORDER AUTHORIZING USE OF CASH COLLATERAL TO PAY PAYROLL AND OTHER NECESSARY EXPENSES Filed by Paul M. Bach on behalf of Redline Metals, Inc. . (Bach, Paul) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Authorize
Fri 09/06 4:57 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Authorize Debtor to authorizing the Debtor to pay or honor prepetition obligations to certain critical vendors and scheduling a hearing Filed by Penelope N Bach on behalf of Redline Metals, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 9/10/2024 at 01:30 PM at Appear In Courtroom 680, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cox. (Bach, Penelope) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Appearance
Thu 09/05 3:52 PM
Appearance Filed by John R O'Connor on behalf of KKSP Precision Machining, LLC. (O'Connor, John) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Request for Service of Notices
Wed 09/04 5:22 AM
Request for Service of Notices Filed by BMW Financial Services NA, LLC, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC. (Sharma, Amitkumar) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Request for Service of Notices
Wed 09/04 5:14 AM
Request for Service of Notices Filed by BMW Financial Services NA, LLC, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC. (Sharma, Amitkumar) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 08/30 11:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. . No. of Notices: 112. Notice Date 08/30/2024. (Admin.) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 08/30 10:52 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Eric J Malnar on behalf of Matthew D. Benoist. (Malnar, Eric) |
|
21 | 21
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Fri 08/30 9:45 AM
(E)Hearing Continued . hearing scheduled for 09/10/2024 at 01:30 PM at Appear in Courtroom 680, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cox. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
20 | 20
order
Pay Prepetition Wages
Fri 08/30 9:45 AM
Order Granting Motion To Pay Prepetition Wages . Signed on 8/30/2024. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
19 | 19
order
Use Cash Collateral
Fri 08/30 9:40 AM
Order Granting in Part, Continuing Motion To Use Cash Collateral . Hearing scheduled for 9/10/2024 at 01:30 PM at Appear In Courtroom 680, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cox. Signed on 8/30/2024. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Appearance
Thu 08/29 3:29 PM
Appearance Filed by Edgar A Quintero on behalf of Revcor, Inc.. (Quintero, Edgar) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Appearance
Thu 08/29 2:42 PM
Appearance Filed by Amy E Daleo on behalf of Charter Steel Trading Co., Inc.. (Daleo, Amy) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 08/29 2:38 PM
Proposed Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING DEBTOR TO PAY PRE-PETITION CLAIMS FOR WAGES, SALARIES, REIMBURSABLE EXPENSES, AND EMPLOYEE BENEFITS Filed by Paul M. Bach on behalf of Redline Metals, Inc. . (Bach, Paul) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 08/29 2:37 PM
Proposed Order - INTERIM ORDER AUTHORIZING USE OF CASH COLLATERAL TO PAY PAYROLL AND OTHER NECESSARY EXPENSES Filed by Paul M. Bach on behalf of Redline Metals, Inc. . (Bach, Paul) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Appearance
Thu 08/29 2:07 PM
Appearance Filed by Edmond M Burke on behalf of Revcor, Inc.. (Burke, Edmond) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Appearance
Thu 08/29 11:52 AM
Appearance Filed by William J Factor on behalf of MacLean - Fogg Component Solutions LLC. (Factor, William) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Pay Prepetition Wages
Wed 08/28 9:26 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Pay Prepetition Wages Salaries and Reimbursable Expenses Filed by Paul M. Bach on behalf of Redline Metals, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/30/2024 at 09:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Baer. (Bach, Paul) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Cash Collateral (Use)
Wed 08/28 9:24 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Use Cash Collateral thru: Interim Use through at least September 10, 2024 Filed by Paul M. Bach on behalf of Redline Metals, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/30/2024 at 09:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Baer. (Bach, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Budget | ||
10 | 10
misc
Appearance
Wed 08/28 4:44 PM
Appearance for Jeremiah E. Shavers Filed by Kurt M. Carlson on behalf of Old Second National Bank. (Carlson, Kurt) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Appearance
Wed 08/28 2:09 PM
Appearance Filed by Morgan I Marcus on behalf of Old Second National Bank. (Marcus, Morgan) |
|
8 | 8
order
Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion
Wed 08/28 2:06 PM
Order Granting Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion . Signed on 8/28/2024. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Appearance
Wed 08/28 2:03 PM
Appearance Filed by Adam B. Rome on behalf of CR 1255 Gilford, LLC. (Rome, Adam) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion
Wed 08/28 12:55 PM
Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion Filed by Paul M. Bach on behalf of Redline Metals, Inc.. (Bach, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING DEBTOR TO USE CASH COLLATERAL BELONGING TO OLD SECOND NATIONAL BANK REGARDING THE DEBTORS BUSINESS ASSETS | ||
Att: 2 MOTION FOR AUTHORITY TO PAY PRE-PETITION CLAIMS FOR WAGES, SALARIES AND REIMBURSABLE EXPENSES | ||
5 | 5
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Wed 08/28 10:27 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case . 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/25/2024 at 01:30 PM at Appear by Telephone: (866) 654-5711 Passcode: 5932337. Last day to object to dischargeability is 11/25/2024. (Gutierrez, Evelyn) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
crditcrd
none
Tue 08/27 6:12 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-12590 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B48324250. Fee Amount $1738.00 (Bach, Paul) (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:28 PM
Appearance Filed by Lina Toma on behalf of Old Second National Bank. (Toma, Lina) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:27 PM
Appearance Filed by Kurt M. Carlson on behalf of Old Second National Bank. (Carlson, Kurt) |
|
1 | 1
26
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11a)
Tue 08/27 3:27 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738, Filed by Paul M. Bach on behalf of Redline Metals, Inc. (Bach, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Pages |