Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-03219
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2024
Terminated:Jul 29, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 2:40 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Duty AUSA-El Paso
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jose Manuel Chigo Santos (1)
Terminated: 07/29/2024
Represented By
Samantha Rago
Law Office Of Samantha Rago
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/28/2024 3:38 AM CDT
Monday, July 29, 2024
Oral Motion to Remit Special Assessment Fee by USA as to Jose Manuel Chigo Santos. (epda)
Related: [-]
Oral Order GRANTING [] Motion to Remit Special Assessment Fee as to Jose Manuel Chigo Santos (1). Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (epda)
Related: [-]
1 1 Petty Documents as to Jose Manuel Chigo Santos (epda)
Related: [-]