United Sovereign Americans, Inc. et al v. NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS et al
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard E Myers, II |
Referred: | Robert B Jones, Jr |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00128 |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Cause | 28:1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Aug 28, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 3:15 PM EDT |
Petitioner
United Sovereign Americans, Inc.
167 Lamp & Lantern Village, Suite 194
Chesterfield, MO 63017 |
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Richard Yost
3652 Jordan Circle
Franklinton, NC 27525 |
Represented By
|
Respondent
Merrick Garland
|
|
Respondent
NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS
430 N. SALISBURY STREET 3RD FLOOR 6400 MSC
RALEIGH, NC 27603 |
|
Respondent
Mr. Joshua Stein
North Carolina Attorney General 114 West Edenton Street
Raleigh, NC 27603 |
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Redesignating Division
Fri 08/30 11:29 AM
Order Redesignating Division to Western Division. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/29/2024. (McNally, Kimberly) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer
Fri 08/30 11:32 AM
Intradistrict Transfer to Western Division. New Case No.: 5:24-cv-500-M-RJ. (McNally, Kimberly) |
||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/29 3:34 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Richard Yost (Ceradini, Matthew) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/29 3:30 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Phillip Ceradini on behalf of United Sovereign Americans, Inc., Richard Yost. (Ceradini, Matthew) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure
Thu 08/29 2:40 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Richard Yost. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) |
||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Thu 08/29 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding3 Notice of Special Appearance. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1(e)(1), the Special Appearance Attorney must complete the "electronic filing attorney registration form" and comply with Section IV.D ofthe Policy Manual. Once Counsel receives their login and password, they must file their notice of special appearance so that they will be added to the docket and be able to receive notices of electronic filing "NEF's". (Rudd, D.) |
||
notice
Notice to Counsel
Thu 08/29 3:07 PM
Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) |
||
notice
Notice to Counsel
Thu 08/29 3:08 PM
Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.) |
||
notice
Notice to Counsel
Thu 08/29 3:18 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding:4 Notice - other Proposed Summons . When the defendant is a government agency or employee, summonses are required for the agency or employee, the U.S. Attorney General, and the U.S. Attorney Civil Process Clerk. Counsel should file a proposed summons for the U.S. Attorney Civil Process Clerk using the event "Notice-Other". (Rudd, D.) |
||
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/28 4:09 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by United Sovereign Americans, Inc. (Ceradini, Matthew) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice-other
Wed 08/28 4:02 PM
Notice filed by United Sovereign Americans, Inc., Richard Yost regarding1 Complaint - PROPOSED SUMMONSES . (Ceradini, Matthew) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Special Appearance
Wed 08/28 3:09 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Matthew Phillip Ceradini on behalf of United Sovereign Americans, Inc., Richard Yost. (Ceradini, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice-other
Wed 08/28 3:06 PM
Notice filed by United Sovereign Americans, Inc., Richard Yost regarding1 Complaint - CIVIL COVER SHEET . (Ceradini, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/28 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT with Exhibits A - D against Merrick Garland, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, Joshua Stein ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7752005.), filed by United Sovereign Americans, Inc., Richard Yost. (Ceradini, Matthew) |