Donohoe et al v. Hines et al
South Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Eric C Schulte |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04158 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 3:13 PM CDT |
Defendant
C & W Trucking & Sons, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Antonio Urquiola Cortinas
|
|
Defendant
Antonio Hines
|
|
Defendant
May Leasing, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Howard Moore
|
|
Defendant
Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Proquality Transport & Logistics Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Raymond Rosado
|
|
Plaintiff
Conner Donohoe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Donohoe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Vostad
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice
Mon 09/09 4:52 PM
NOTICE by Connor Donohoe, Michael Donohoe, Patricia Vostad Notice of Service in accordance with SDCL § 15-7-7 .(Tysdal, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Admissions of Service on behalf of Antonio Urquiola Cortinas, Antonio Hines, Howard Moore, and Raymond Rosado, | ||
Att: 2 Copy of Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Copy of Summonses, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit of Compliance with SDCL § 15-7-7 | ||
6 | 6
service
Admission of Service
Mon 09/09 4:40 PM
ADMISSION of Service of Summons/Complaint served on Monae Johnson, on behalf of Antonio Urquiola Cortinas, Antonio Hines, Howard Moore, and Raymond Rosado on September 4, 2024, filed by Connor Donohoe, Michael Donohoe, Patricia Vostad. (Tysdal, Matthew) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/30 9:38 AM
Summons Issued as to C & W Trucking & Sons, Inc, Antonio Urquiola Cortinas, Antonio Hines, May Leasing, LLC, Howard Moore, Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P., Proquality Transport & Logistics Services, LLC, Raymond Rosado. eight Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: [LINK:National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (DJP) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Request for Issuance of Summons(es)
Thu 08/29 11:02 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Connor Donohoe. (Tysdal, Matthew) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Request for Issuance of Summons(es)
Thu 08/29 10:40 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Connor Donohoe. (Tysdal, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Request for Issuance of Summons(es)
Thu 08/29 10:33 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Connor Donohoe. (Heidepriem, Pete) |
|
notice
Notice of Filing Error
Thu 08/29 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Filing Error:2 Request for Issuance of Summons was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Heidepriem, Pete) |
||
notice
Notice of Filing Error
Thu 08/29 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Filing Error:3 Request for Issuance of Summons was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Tysdal, Matthew) |
||
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)
Wed 08/28 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4357200, in shell case on 08/28/2024 filed by Patricia Vostad, Michael Donohoe and Conner Donohoe. (MSB) |