John Thyberg v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04728 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 4:18 PM EDT |
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Plaintiff
John Thyberg
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 08/29 3:33 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 08/29/2024), John Thyberg v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04728-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern District of Pennsylvania (wmil) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/29 3:32 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil) |
|
1 | 1
49
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/29 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11962819.), filed by John Thyberg. Service due by 11/27/2024 (wmil) |