Kenneth Davidson v. Family Barbershop et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr |
Referred: | Brianna Fuller Mircheff |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-07380 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 3:13 PM PDT |
Defendant
Family Barbershop
|
|
Defendant
On Third Apartments LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Davidson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 09/16 11:03 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kenneth Davidson, upon Defendant On Third Apartments LLC served on 9/11/2024, answer due 10/2/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ishmael Morales, Owner in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason) |
|
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 09/16 11:00 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kenneth Davidson, upon Defendant Family Barbershop served on 9/11/2024, answer due 10/2/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ishmael Morales, Owner in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
4
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/13 5:26 PM
ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION AND DISMISSING UNRUH ACT CLAIM by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. See document for details. (gk) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Response
Thu 09/12 2:01 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Davidsonto Order to Show Cause,,10 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 08/30 1:55 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff within 14 days after entry of this Order to show cause in writing why the Court should not dismiss without prejudice his Unruh Act claim under Section 1367(c)(4). Plaintiff's response must identify the amount of statutory damages Plaintiff seeks to recover. If Plaintiff fails to file a response within 14 days after entry of this Order, the Court will decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over his Unruh Act claim, and the Unruh Act claim will be automatically dismissed without prejudice without further order of the Court. (gk) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 08/30 9:27 AM
Standing Order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (lfa) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 08/29 4:59 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Family Barbershop, On Third Apartments LLC. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 08/29 4:57 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 08/29 4:57 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 08/29 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 08/29 2:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Kenneth Davidson. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 08/29 2:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 08/29 2:32 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Davidson. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 08/29 2:31 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38122445 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Kenneth Davidson(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |