Teague et al v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04679 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2024 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:24-cv-06008 |
Last checked: Friday Aug 30, 2024 10:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
individually and as successor in interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E I Dupont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Spencer Verhines
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Vaughn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Vaughn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Vargas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Vanzile
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robin Vandiver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcella Van Wie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Van Osdel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sabino Valladares
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Valencia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angel Valencia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henry Valdez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crystal Vadney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Walls
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberley Vaccher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laurie Urias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lindsay Urena-Tio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Underwood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricky Wagstaff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jotice Wallace
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Helena Wallace
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Wall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vernon Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Waldrep
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Walding
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Walden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lister Victory
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Wagner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Voytko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Voorhees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Viviano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Vittori
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Vincent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Vieira
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Viechec
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Thomson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stanley Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricky Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jay Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bonnie Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ayanna Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Thomason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeanette Thomason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Thorn-Leeson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sylvia Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rudy Thibaudeau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Terry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kanen Terry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eddie Terrebonne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Teague
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Estate of Ulysses Toms Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Estate Of Robert Terrazas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mariano Toro, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Turnage
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerald Tuck, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Tucci
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Trujillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marshall Troup
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Trent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynda Torres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonor Torres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erica Torres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty Tyler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christian Tofte
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rex Todhunter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Tobler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Tindell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aranita Timmons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lary Don Tidball
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brad Tibbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Thurber
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/10 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Welch, Mickey Wells, Eddie Wilson, Clay Snyder, Ronald Snyder, Ricky Wagstaff NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY LISTED PLAINTIFFS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-06684-RMG, 2:24-cv-04678-RMG, 2:24-cv-04679-RMG, 2:24-cv-04680-RMG(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/10 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Raymond Tardif, Larry Bynum, Neal Nesset, Laurie Urias, Timothy Waldrep, Gloria Mendoza NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY LISTED PLAINTIFFS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 09/05 4:03 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rhei, ) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 08/29 10:53 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:24-cv-06008, Teague et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04679 (jbin) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 08/29 10:41 AM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-06008. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/26/2024) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/29/2024.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/29/2024.] | ||
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/29/2024.] | ||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/29/2024.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/29/2024.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/29/2024.] | ||
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jordan David Sagalowsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: THE 3M COMPANY, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted;. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/29/2024.] | ||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by THE 3M COMPANY, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co...(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/29/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/29/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 152280/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29720146).Document filed by THE 3M COMPANY, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co...(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/29/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial |