California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:J Barrett Marum
Case #: 3:24-bk-03230
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
California Premier Office Solutions, Inc.
9335 Airway Rd Ste 213
San Diego, CA 92154-7930
Represented By
Anthony Egbase
A.O.E Law & Associates
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
163 163 8 pgs motion Employ (Application) Fri 04/25 3:28 PM
Ex Parte Application to Employ [Ex Parte Application To Employ Fennemore LLP As General Counsel For Ronald E. Stadtmueller, Chapter 11 Trustee] filed by Gary B. Rudolph on behalf of Ronald E. Stadtmueller (Rudolph, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 27 pgs Declaration [Declaration Of Gary B. Rudolph, Esq. In Support Of Ex Parte Application To Employ Fennemore LLP As General Counsel For Ronald E. Stadtmueller, Chapter 11 Trustee]
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Thursday, April 24, 2025
162 162 1 pgs vCal Court Minutes Continued - CHAP Thu 04/24 3:54 PM
Court Minutes Hearing Date 04/24/2025, MATTER: STATUS CONFERENCE ON CHAPTER 11 PETITION (fr 3/26/25) DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. HEARING Scheduled for 06/26/2025 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 2, Room 118, Weinberger Courthouse Related [+] (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
161 161 2 pgs notice Appearance / Special (Notice) Thu 04/24 11:18 AM
Request for Notice [Request for Special Notice] filed by Gary B. Rudolph on behalf of Fennemore LLP. (Rudolph, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
160 160 1 pgs vCal Tentative Ruling - CHAP Wed 04/23 9:57 AM
Tentative Ruling. Department 2: Hearing Date and Time: 04/24/2025 @ 2:00 PM Related [+] (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
Friday, April 18, 2025
159 159 4 pgs misc Report Fri 04/18 1:43 PM
Trustee's Status Report On Chapter 11 Petition filed by Ronald E. Stadtmueller on behalf of Ronald E. Stadtmueller. Related [+] (Stadtmueller, Ronald)
Related: [-] 154 Court Minutes Continued
158 158 62 pgs misc Operating Report (Chapter 11) (UST Form 11-MOR) - non-small business Fri 04/18 1:39 PM
March 2025 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Ronald E. Stadtmueller on behalf of Ronald E. Stadtmueller. (Stadtmueller, Ronald)
Related: [-]