Colombe et al v. United States of America
South Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence L Piersol |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-05069 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1346 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 03, 2024 12:13 PM CDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Kaktis Carlson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vesta Carlson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Colombe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Wed 09/11 3:06 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 09/11/2024. (KLE) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extend
Fri 09/06 3:21 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend re1 Complaint, by United States of America. (Warner (USA), Alexis) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Ext of Time to file Answer or Otherwise Defend | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/06 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis Anne Warner (USA) on behalf of United States of America. (Warner (USA), Alexis) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Admission of Service
Thu 09/05 5:23 PM
ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Diana Ryan on 9/3/24, filed by Lisa Colombe. (Zephier, Robin) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 09/03 11:33 AM
Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es) delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (JMS) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)
Tue 09/03 11:31 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4359650, in shell case on 09/03/2024 filed by Lisa Colombe, Vesta Carlson, Kaktis Carlson. (JMS) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Letters, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Letters, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Letters |