Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00374
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 06, 2024 2:21 AM CDT
Defendant
Kenneth Cordero (1)
Represented By
Marc J Fratter
Law Office Of Marc J. Fratter
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph T. Lo Galbo-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 3:32 AM CDT
Monday, July 29, 2024
2 2 MOTION to Continue, MOTION for Detention () filed by USA as to Kenneth Cordero. (kaf) [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford: Initial Appearance as to Kenneth Cordero held on 8/14/2024. Date of Arrest: 8/13/2024. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Linda Requenez; Defense - Mark J. Fratter. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :03. (Court Reporter: Debbie Kriegshauser) (mcrd) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/15/2024) (mcrd). [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Marc J Fratter appearing for Kenneth Cordero (If sealed documents that you are authorized to see were previously filed by U.S. Pretrial Services or U.S. Probation, you will require assistance to gain access to them and any related filings. Please call the clerk at 214.753.2240 during business hours to request access.) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
6 6 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kenneth Cordero. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Kenneth Cordero. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
8 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Kenneth Cordero : by this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is in addition to the oral order entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel were present. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/14/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Kenneth Cordero. Detention Hearing set for 8/19/2024 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1306, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/14/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
11 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice without Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14844688) filed by Kenneth Cordero (Fratter, Marc) Modified text on 8/16/2024 (knb). [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford: Detention Hearing as to Kenneth Cordero not held on 8/19/2024. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Joe Lo Galbo; Defense - Marc Fratter. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Kenneth Cordero. Detention Hearing set for 8/26/2024 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1306, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/19/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
12 12 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 7/29/2024 as to Kenneth Cordero. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
15 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Kenneth Cordero: Before the court is an Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice without Certificate of Good Standing filed 8/15/2024. Attorney Marc J Fratter is ordered to refile his Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice that includes a Certificate of Good Standing. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/22/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
16 16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Kenneth Cordero (Fratter, Marc) [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
17 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marc J. Fratter. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). as to Kenneth Cordero (1). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/23/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
18 18 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford: Detention Hearing as to Kenneth Cordero not held on 8/26/2024. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Joe Lo Galbo; Defense - Marc Fratter. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :05. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (mcrd) (mcrd). Modified on 8/26/2024 (mcrd). [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
19 19 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Kenneth Cordero. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
20 20 DETENTION ORDER as to Kenneth Cordero (1). (see order) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/26/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00681-BK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
21 21 INDICTMENT with Forfeiture Notice as to Kenneth Cordero (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, 4. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (agc)
Related: [-]