Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Margaret R Guzman
Case #: 4:24-cv-40114
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1345 Property Damage
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2024
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 05, 2025 4:47 AM EST
Defendant
Worcester Police Department
Plaintiff
Charbel George Slaybi
63 Park Terace Road
Worcester, MA 01604

GPO Apr 22 2025
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. The court dismisses this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). See Order for further details. (bm)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
18 18 appeal USCA Case Number Thu 04/24 6:46 AM
USCA Case Number 25-1399 for14 Notice of Appeal, filed by Charbel George Slaybi. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
17 17 appeal Abbreviated Electronic Appeal Record Sent to USCA Wed 04/23 2:59 PM
Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re14 Notice of Appeal. (MAP)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/23 10:37 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered DENYING AS MOOT motion15 for leave to appeal in forma pauperis because plaintiff was already granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis on September 9, 2024. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3)(A) (A party who was permitted to proceed in forma pauperis in the district-court action... may proceed on appeal in forma pauperis without further authorization....). (bm)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/23 10:17 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Charbel George Slaybi.(MC)
Related: [-]
14 14 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 04/23 10:15 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to12 Order Dismissing Case by Charbel George Slaybi. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at [LINK:http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov] MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 5/13/2025. (MC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
13 13 misc Copy Mailed Tue 04/22 11:31 AM
Copy re11 Order and12 Order Dismissing Case handed to Charbel George Slaybi on 4/22/2025. Plaintiff appeared in person to pick up documents over the counter. Modified text on 4/22/2025 (JB)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/22 10:01 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(bm)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/22 10:00 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. The court dismisses this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). See Order for further details. (bm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
10 10 misc Letter/request - non-motion Mon 03/31 4:15 PM
Request for 6-month List from Charbel George Slaybi. (JB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
9 9 motion Expedite Thu 02/13 4:25 PM
MOTION for Expedited Hearing by Charbel George Slaybi.(JB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, February 10, 2025
8 8 service Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2 Mon 02/10 11:48 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Charbel George Slaybi re7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (JB)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
7 7 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 02/07 2:49 PM
MOTION for Do Not Contact Order by Charbel George Slaybi.(LB)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 09/23 1:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Worcester Police Department, filed by Charbel George Slaybi.(JB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, September 09, 2024
5 5 misc Copy Mailed Mon 09/09 8:28 AM
Copy re4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, mailed to Charbel George Slaybi on 9/9/2024. (Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
4 4 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 09/09 8:11 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The complaint is subject to dismissal and, to the extent that Slaybi intends to proceed,he shall, on or before October 11, 2024, file an amended complaint that states a basis for this Court's jurisdiction and also states a plausible claim for relief. (PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/06 11:51 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charbel George Slaybi.(Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 09/06 11:48 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Margaret R. Guzman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/06 11:47 AM
COMPLAINT against Worcester Police Department, filed by Charbel George Slaybi.(Burgos, Sandra) (Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Form
Att: 2 (9/6/2024) summons