California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Wayne E Johnson
Case #: 6:24-bk-15300
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Oct 08, 2024
Terminated:Dec 05, 2024

Debtor
Imaginary Corporation
54790 N Circle Dr
Idyllwild, CA 92549-2549
Represented By
Bradley Jerrod Yourist
Bradley J. Yourist
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Larry D Simons (TR)
3610 Central Avenue, Suite 400
Riverside, CA 92506
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 09/07/2024 1:38 AM PDT
Friday, September 06, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 09/06 1:48 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:6:24-bk-15300] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57338347. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 09/06 1:46 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Imaginary Corporation (Yourist, Bradley)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Fri 09/06 2:06 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Simons (TR), Larry D with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/8/2024 at 10:00 AM via Zoom - Simons: Meeting ID 495 175 0324, Passcode 3027598776, Phone 1 909 498 7813. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]