Rogers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Iowa Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonard T Strand |
Referred: | Mark A Roberts |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00093 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 09/11 10:10 AM
DOCKET Annotation: Please see New Social Security Case Packet attached. (mmc) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint - Social Security Only
Wed 09/11 10:08 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Beau Rogers. (mmc) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Social Security
Wed 09/11 10:07 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and to notify the Commissioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 9/11/2024. (mmc) |
|
notice
Notice - Social Security Case Service
Wed 09/11 10:09 AM
Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules of Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summons shall issue. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/11/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (mmc) |
||
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 09/10 10:12 AM
Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Motions referred to Mark A Roberts. (No conflicts identified). (ksy) |
||
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Social Security
Mon 09/09 12:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Beau Rogers (Kappelman, Wes) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |