Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-14599

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Deborah J Saltzman
Case #: 2:24-ap-01225
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Joe Potchanard Chauvapun, M.D.
Represented By
Joe Potchanard Chauvapun, M.D.
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel S Pena
Represented By
Christopher O Rivas
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Guthrie Castle Limited
Represented By
Christopher O Rivas
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
14 14 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 04/17 9:32 PM
Hearing Held (Bk Other) status conference Related [+]. COURT RULING: Continued to 7/8/25 at 1:00 p.m. No status report. (MB2)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 04/17 9:33 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 07/08/2025 at 01:00 PM 255 E. Temple St.Courtroom 1639Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (MB2)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Daniel S Pena
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
13 13 notice Notice Wed 04/16 10:10 AM
Notice REGARDING SETTLEMENT OF ADVERSARY CASE, PENDING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SAME Filed by Plaintiffs Guthrie Castle Limited, Daniel S Pena. (Rivas, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
12 12 court Hearing Held (Other) Tue 01/07 5:38 PM
Hearing Held Related [+]. COURT RULING: Status conference continued to 4/17/25 at 1:00 p.m., no status report needed. (MB2)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Daniel S Pena, Plaintiff Guthrie Castle Limited
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Tue 01/07 6:12 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 04/17/2025 at 01:00 PM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1639 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (MB2)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Daniel S Pena
Thursday, December 26, 2024
11 11 misc Status report Thu 12/26 1:35 PM
Status report Joint Status Report Filed by Plaintiffs Guthrie Castle Limited, Daniel S Pena Related [+]. (Rivas, Christopher)
Related: [-] 8 Hearing Held (Bk Other)
10 10 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Thu 12/26 10:13 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Document filed without the holographic signature of Robert P. Goe. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER SIGNATURES. Related [+] (MB2)
Related: [-] 9 Status report filed by Plaintiff Daniel S Pena
Monday, December 23, 2024
9 9 misc Status report Mon 12/23 4:01 PM
Status report Joint Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Daniel S Pena Related [+]. (Rivas, Christopher)
Related: [-] Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case)
Thursday, November 21, 2024
8 8 court Hearing Held (Other) Fri 11/22 2:10 PM
Hearing (not) Held Related [+]. COURT RULING: Hearing vacated. Continued from 11/21/24 to 1/7/25 at 1:00p.m. per stip & order entered on 10/15/24. (MB2)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Daniel S Pena
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Tue 11/19 4:54 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 01/07/2025 at 01:00 PM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1639 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (MB2)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Daniel S Pena
Monday, October 28, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/28 3:59 PM
Answer to Complaint Defendant Joe Potchanard Chauvapun's Answer to Complaint to Determine Nondischargeability of Certain Debts with Proof of Service Filed by Joe Potchanard Chauvapun. (Goe, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 10/17 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
5 5 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Tue 10/15 3:03 PM
Order Granting Stipulation and ORDER thereon to Extend Deadline for defendant to respond to complaint - Extension granted to 10/31/24 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/15/2024 (NV)
Related: [-] 4
Monday, October 14, 2024
4 4 motion Stipulation (motion) Mon 10/14 4:09 PM
Stipulation By Joe Potchanard Chauvapun and Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Complaint with proof of Service Filed by Defendant Joe Potchanard Chauvapun (Goe, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 09/11 3:25 PM
Summons Service Executed on Joe Potchanard Chauvapun 9/11/2024 (Rivas, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 09/10 11:46 AM
Summons Issued on Joe Potchanard Chauvapun Date Issued 9/10/2024, Answer Due 10/10/2024 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/21/2024 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman. Due to the COVID-19 public health emergency, the courtroom will be closed to the public and the hearing will be held via ZoomGov, which provides both audio and video access. All parties and members of the public may connect to the hearing free of charge. ZoomGov connection information for this hearing will be posted on the Court's public calendar for Judge Saltzman, accessible on the court's website: http://ecf-ciao.cacb.uscourts.gov/CiaoPosted/default.aspx (MB2)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Daniel S Pena, Plaintiff Guthrie Castle Limited
Monday, September 09, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/09 12:35 PM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-01225. Complaint by Daniel S Pena, Guthrie Castle Limited against Joe Potchanard Chauvapun, M.D.. Fee Amount $350 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts Nature of Suit: (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Rivas, Christopher)
Related: [-]