Tillman et al v. Richman Property Services, Inc. et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | James E Simmons, Jr |
Referred: | Barbara Lynn Major |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01598 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1441cra Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 24CU004504C |
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2024 2:11 PM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1 through 10
|
|
Defendant
Richman Property Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Tillman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Natalie Tillman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order of Transfer Pursuant to Low Number Rule
Mon 09/16 8:15 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE, re4 Notice of Related Case. Case reassigned to District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. Judge Roger T. Benitez, Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner no longer assigned to case. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge(s) have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge(s). Create association to 3:24-cv-01557-JES-BLM. The new case number is 24CV1598-JES-BLM.. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/10/2024. Signed by Judge James E. Simmons, Jr. on 9/10/2024.(jpp) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 09/12 5:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richman Property Services, Inc. re8 Notice (Other),7 MOTION to Transfer or, in the Alterantive, Motion to Dismiss ,9 Certificate of Service (Strauss, Benjamin) |
|
9 | 9
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 09/12 2:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richman Property Services, Inc. re8 Notice (Other),7 MOTION to Transfer or, in the Alterantive, Motion to Dismiss (Strauss, Benjamin) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/12 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Constitutional Question by Richman Property Services, Inc. (Strauss, Benjamin) (jpp) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 09/11 3:51 PM
MOTION to Transfer or, in the Alterantive, Motion to Dismiss by Richman Property Services, Inc..(Strauss, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to RJN, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to RJN, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to RJN, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to RJN, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to RJN, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 to RJN, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 to RJN, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 to RJN, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 to RJN, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 to RJN, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 to RJN, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 to RJN | ||
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/10 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel for Plaintiffs by David Tillman, Natalie Tillman (Brod, Gregory)Attorney Gregory J. Brod added to party David Tillman(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Brod added to party Natalie Tillman(pty:pla) (jpp) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 09/09 2:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richman Property Services, Inc. re3 Notice of Party With Financial Interest,2 Corporate Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal,4 Notice of Related Case (Strauss, Benjamin) (jpp) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Related Case
Mon 09/09 11:54 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Richman Property Services, Inc. of case(s) 24-cv-01557-JES-BLM. (axi) (sjt) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Mon 09/09 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Richman Property Services, Inc.. Identifying Other Affiliate Richard Richman, Other Affiliate Brooke Richman, Other Affiliate Scott Richman, Other Affiliate Kristin Miller, Other Affiliate David Salzman, Other Affiliate Brian Myers, Other Affiliate Bowhead Specialty/Homesite Insurance Company of Florida for Richman Property Services, Inc. (axi) (sjt) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 09/09 11:46 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Richman Property Services, Inc. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (axi) (sjt) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 09/09 11:42 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19165572.), filed by Richman Property Services, Inc. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1598-BEN-DDL. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case.(axi) (sjt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 3 Disclosure Statement re: Parties in a Diversity Case |