Pledge v. Gardner et al
Iowa Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Cj Williams |
Referred: | Kelly KE Mahoney |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00096 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2024 |
Defendant
Brian D Gardner
|
|
Defendant
Chad Shover
|
|
Defendant
Doug Riniker
|
|
Defendant
Kent Steenblock
|
|
Defendant
Matt Pavelka
|
|
Defendant
Matthew Sandvick
|
|
Defendant
Munier
|
|
Defendant
Nurse Tia 1002
|
|
Defendant
Snyder
|
|
Plaintiff
Emmanuel Terrill Pledge
|
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 09/13 2:08 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Department of Justice, Iowa Office of Ombudsman, Munier, Nurse Tia 1002, Snyder, Bernardo Granwehr, Bert Dalmer, Brian Sissle, Brian D Gardner, Chad Shover, Doug Riniker, Kent Steenblock, Matt Pavelka, Matthew Sandvick, Monica Slaughter, Nicholas Maybanks, Nicholas L Scott, Unknown Deputies, Unknown Sergeants against Plaintiff Emmanuel Terrill Pledge. Plaintiff take nothing and these actions are dismissed. Signed by Clerk on 9/13/2024. Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-00069-CJW-KEM, 1:24-cv-00072-CJW-KEM, 1:24-cv-00084-CJW-KEM, 1:24-cv-00092-CJW-KEM, 1:24-cv-00096-CJW-KEM (Copy to Plaintiff) (des) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint (Dismissal Ddl)
Fri 09/13 1:59 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Plaintiff Emmanuel Terrill Pledge (NEF to Plaintiff) (des) |
|
2 | 2
order
Initial Review Order Dismissing Case
Fri 09/13 1:26 PM
MEMORANDUM Opinion Order Dismissing Cases: Pro Se Motions to proceed in forma pauperis are granted. Clerk to docket the complaints without the prepayment of fees. Prisoner Emmanuel Terrill Pledge pay initial partial filing fee of $4.00 for each case. Signed by Chief Judge CJ Williams on 9/13/2024. Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-00069-CJW-KEM, 1:24-cv-00072-CJW-KEM, 1:24-cv-00084-CJW-KEM, 1:24-cv-00092-CJW-KEM, 1:24-cv-00096-CJW-KEM (Copy/Appeal packet to Plaintiff, Copy to Warden/Administrator) (des) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 09/10 9:35 AM
PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Emmanuel Terrill Pledge. (PSLC) (NEF to Plaintiff) (jlh) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint |