Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referred: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Case #: 8:24-cv-02140
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2024
Terminated:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 09, 2025 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Thomas Ophof
Represented By
John McQueen Miller, III
Boy Agnew Potanovic Miller, PLLC
contact info
Katherine E. Cook
Boy Agnew Potanovic Miller, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Saltworks Fab, LLC
Represented By
John McQueen Miller, III
Boy Agnew Potanovic Miller, PLLC
contact info
Katherine E. Cook
Boy Agnew Potanovic Miller, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Isaiah Scherrer
Represented By
Conor Foley
Gunterfirm
contact info
Jason L. Gunter
Gunterfirm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
24 24 order Amended Order Tue 12/03 3:54 PM
ORDER amending case caption in 22 Order Approving Settlement and Dismissing Case with Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 12/3/2024. (CES)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
23 23 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 12/02 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
Related: [-]
22 22 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Mon 12/02 11:55 AM
ORDER granting 21 Motion for Order Approving Settlement and Dismissing Case with Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 12/2/2024. (CES)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
21 21 motion Settlement Fri 11/22 10:54 AM
Joint MOTION for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal with Prejudice by Isaiah Scherrer. (Gunter, Jason) Modified docket text on 11/22/2024 (JOS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
20 20 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/05 1:46 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-2140-AAS. Judge Mary S. Scriven no longer assigned to the case. (AG)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of settlement Tue 11/05 1:32 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Thomas Ophof, Saltworks Fab, LLC (Miller, John)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Tue 11/05 8:36 AM
ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/5/2024. (KBC)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 11/05 2:30 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The parties need not attend the IDEAL Conference scheduled for 11/18/2024 due to 19 NOTICE of Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 11/5/2024. (CES)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
17 17 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/04 12:14 PM
PROPOSED CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Thomas Ophof, Saltworks Fab, LLC. (Miller, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
16 16 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/17 1:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Isaiah Scherrer. (Gunter, Jason)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/17 10:06 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Thomas Ophof, Saltworks Fab, LLC. (Miller, John)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 10/17 10:03 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Thomas Ophof, Saltworks Fab, LLC. Related case(s): No (Miller, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 10/17 9:57 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John McQueen Miller, III on behalf of Thomas Ophof, Saltworks Fab, LLC. Lead Counsel: John M. Miller. (Miller, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
12 12 order Order Wed 10/16 11:37 AM
ENDORSED ORDER scheduling IDEAL Videoconference for 11/18/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. The court will send counsel a calendar entry containing a link to the videoconference information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 10/16/2024. (BEE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 10/15 4:13 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Katherine E. Cook of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 10/11 12:37 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 9 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have up to and including November 10, 2024, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/11/2024. (KBC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 10/09 9:09 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Thomas Ophof, Saltworks Fab, LLC. (Cook, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
8 8 service Summons returned executed Tue 09/24 1:45 PM
RETURN of service executed on 9/19/2024 by Isaiah Scherrer as to Saltworks Fab, LLC. (Gunter, Jason)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons returned executed Tue 09/24 1:43 PM
RETURN of service executed on 9/19/2024 by Isaiah Scherrer as to Thomas Ophof. (Gunter, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Thu 09/12 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (JS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 09/11 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason L. Gunter on behalf of Isaiah Scherrer. Lead Counsel: Jason L. Gunter. (Gunter, Jason)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 09/11 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Wed 09/11 10:43 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Thomas Ophof, Saltworks Fab, LLC. (BD)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/11 9:53 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-2140-MSS-AAS. (AA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/10 4:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Thomas Ophof, Saltworks Fab, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22502990) filed by Isaiah Scherrer.(Gunter, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet