Dermeir et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04924 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Northern, 1:24-cv-07384 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 4:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
LN Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lakeland Industries Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Apparel Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Sales LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Narcote Holding Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Narcote LLC
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
TenCate Protective Fabrics USA
6501Mall Blvd.
Union City, GA 30291 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
WL Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corveta, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment Co
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment CO
|
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Innotex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Globe Holding Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Fracek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Jadwin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alicia Jadwin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Booth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred Sullins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Sencion
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Doggett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Van Dermeir
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 09/16 11:22 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Van Dermeir on all defendants(Lumb, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service on defendant AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service on defendant Allstar Fire Equipment Co., | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service on defendant Amerex Corporation, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service on defendant Archroma U.S., Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service on defendant Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service on defendant Carrier Global Corporation, | ||
Att: 7 Certificate of Service on defendant CB Garment, Inc., d/b/a Crewboss, | ||
Att: 8 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemguard, Inc., | ||
Att: 9 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemicals, Inc., | ||
Att: 10 Certificate of Service on defendant Clariant Corporation, | ||
Att: 11 Certificate of Service on defendant Corveta, Inc., | ||
Att: 12 Certificate of Service on defendant Daikin America, Inc., | ||
Att: 13 Certificate of Service on defendant Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., | ||
Att: 14 Certificate of Service on defendant Dynax Corporation, | ||
Att: 15 Certificate of Service on defendant E.I. Du Pont de Nemours & Co., Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, | ||
Att: 16 Certificate of Service on defendant Fire Service Plus, Inc., | ||
Att: 17 Certificate of Service on defendant Fire-Dex, LLC, | ||
Att: 18 Certificate of Service on defendant Globe Holding Company, LLC, | ||
Att: 19 Certificate of Service on defendant Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, | ||
Att: 20 Certificate of Service on defendant Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 21 Certificate of Service on defendant Innotex Corporation, | ||
Att: 22 Certificate of Service on defendant Johnson Controls, Inc., | ||
Att: 23 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., (f/k/a Chubb National Foam, Inc., f/k/a National Foam, Inc.), | ||
Att: 24 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., (f/k/a Fenwal, Inc), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc., | ||
Att: 25 Certificate of Service on defendant Lakeland Industries, Inc., | ||
Att: 26 Certificate of Service on defendant Lion Apparel, Inc., | ||
Att: 27 Certificate of Service on defendant Lion Group, Inc., | ||
Att: 28 Certificate of Service on defendant L.N. Curtis & Sons, | ||
Att: 29 Certificate of Service on defendant Mallory Safety and Supply, LLC, | ||
Att: 30 Certificate of Service on defendant Milliken & Company, | ||
Att: 31 Certificate of Service on defendant Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, | ||
Att: 32 Certificate of Service on defendant MSA Safety Incorporated, | ||
Att: 33 Certificate of Service on defendant MSA Safety Sales, LLC, | ||
Att: 34 Certificate of Service on defendant Municipal Emergency Services, Inc., | ||
Att: 35 Certificate of Service on defendant Narcote Holding Corporation (f/k/a Stedfast, Inc., and/or Stedfast USA, Inc.), | ||
Att: 36 Certificate of Service on defendant Narcote, LLC (f/k/a Stedfast, Inc., and/or Stedfast USA, Inc.), | ||
Att: 37 Certificate of Service on defendant Nation Ford Chemical Company, | ||
Att: 38 Certificate of Service on defendant National Foam, Inc., | ||
Att: 39 Certificate of Service on defendant PBI Performance Products, Inc., | ||
Att: 40 Certificate of Service on defendant Perimeter Solutions, LP, | ||
Att: 41 Certificate of Service on defendant Ricochet Manufacturing Co., Inc., | ||
Att: 42 Certificate of Service on defendant Safety Components Fabric Technologies, Inc., | ||
Att: 43 Certificate of Service on defendant Stedfast USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 44 Certificate of Service on defendant Tencate Protective Fabrics USA, d/b/a Southern Mills, Inc., | ||
Att: 45 Certificate of Service on defendant The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, | ||
Att: 46 Certificate of Service on defendant The Chemours Company, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, | ||
Att: 47 Certificate of Service on defendant Tyco Fire Products, L.P. as Successor-In-Interest to The Ansul Company, | ||
Att: 48 Certificate of Service on defendant United Technologies Corporation, | ||
Att: 49 Certificate of Service on defendant UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (f/k/a GE Interlogix, Inc.), Individually as as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc., | ||
Att: 50 Certificate of Service on defendant Veridian Limited d/b/a Veridian Fire Protective Gear, | ||
Att: 51 Certificate of Service on defendant Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc., d/b/a "The Fire Store", | ||
Att: 52 Certificate of Service on defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc., | ||
Att: 53 Certificate of Service on defendant Arkema, Inc., | ||
Att: 54 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemdesign Products, Inc., | ||
Att: 55 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde PLC, Inc., (f/k/a Williams US Inc., f/k/a Williams Holdins, Inc.), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc. | ||
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/10 6:21 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
14 | 14
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 09/10 2:05 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Northern, 1:24-cv-07384, Dermeir et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04924 (jbin) |
|
13 | 13
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 09/10 1:58 PM
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:24-cv-07384. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
12 | 12 TRANSFERRED to the District of South Carolina the electronic record.(gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/10/2024.] | |
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2873 Conditional Transfer Order filed 9/6/24. (gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/10/2024.] | ||
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
11 | 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to USDC for the District of South Carolina. Mailed notice.(gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/10/2024.] | |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Scott Booth, John Van Dermeir, Walter Doggett, Kevin Fracek, Alicia Jadwin, Mark Jadwin, James Sencion, Alfred Sullins by Mitchell Wald Bild (Bild, Mitchell) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/10/2024.] | |
9 | 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Scott Booth, John Van Dermeir, Walter Doggett, Kevin Fracek, Alicia Jadwin, Mark Jadwin, James Sencion, Alfred Sullins by William T Gibbs (Gibbs, William) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/10/2024.] | |
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Scott Booth, John Van Dermeir, Walter Doggett, Kevin Fracek, Alicia Jadwin, Mark Jadwin, James Sencion, Alfred Sullins by Kenneth Thomas Lumb (Lumb, Kenneth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/10/2024.] | |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 MAILED removal letter to William T Gibbs (jcc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/10/2024.] | |
6 | 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeremy C. Daniel: Minute entry5 is amended as follows: Status hearing set for 10/3/2024 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (as, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/10/2024.] | |
5 | 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeremy C. Daniel: Status hearing set for 9/24/2024 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (as, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/10/2024.] | |
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 3M Company (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/10/2024.] | |
3 | 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 3M Company by Daniel Leslie Ring (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/10/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/10/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2024-L-8449) filed by 3M Company Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22374114.(Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/10/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint | ||
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jeremy C. Daniel. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (man, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/10/2024.] |