California Southern District Court
Judge:Dana M Sabraw
Referred: Karen S Crawford
Case #: 3:24-cv-01623
Nature of Suit151 Contract - Medicare Act
Cause42:1395w-21 Medicare Act (Eligibility, Election, and Enrollment)
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Terminated:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 1:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Xavier Becerra
Represented By
U S Attorney CV
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Katherine L. Parker
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Myndfull Care Management California
Represented By
Bridget A. Gordon
Hooper, Lundy & Bookman
contact info
Patric Hooper
Hooper, Lundy & Bookman, P.C.
contact info

GPO Dec 30 2025
ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. 6 Motion for Summary Judgment; 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/30/2024. (bdc)

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 30, 2024
14 14 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 12/30 3:15 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court GRANTS Defendants Motion to Dismiss and DENIES Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court lacks jurisdiction over the present action. The action is therefore DISMISSED without prejudice.(bdc)
Related: [-]
13 13 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 12/30 2:49 PM
ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment.6 Motion for Summary Judgment;8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/30/2024. (bdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
12 12 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Mon 12/02 2:56 PM
ORDER re: Oral Argument. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/2/2024.(bdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 11/29 10:18 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion filed by Xavier Becerra. (Parker, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
10 10 notice Objection Fri 11/22 8:08 AM
OBJECTION by Myndfull Care Management California re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF ANDREW WEAVER . (Hooper, Patric)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 11/22 8:05 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion AND REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (D.E. 6) filed by Myndfull Care Management California.(Hooper, Patric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Patric Hooper ISO Opposition to MTD
Friday, November 15, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 11/15 4:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion by Xavier Becerra.(Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Andrew Weaver,
Att: 2 Declaration of AUSA Maritsa Flaherty
Thursday, October 03, 2024
7 7 misc Supplemental Briefing Thu 10/03 9:11 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Plaintiff Myndfull Care Management California re6 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Hooper, Patric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
6 6 3 pgs motion Summary Judgment Tue 10/01 1:05 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Myndfull Care Management California.(Hooper, Patric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration
Friday, September 27, 2024
5 5 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Fri 09/27 2:22 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Myndfull Care Management California. Amendment to4 Summons Returned Executed as to USA . (Hooper, Patric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 09/24 8:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Myndfull Care Management California. Xavier Becerra served. (Hooper, Patric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Wed 09/11 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Myndfull Care Management California . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Hooper, Patric)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 09/11 12:20 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axi)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/11 12:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19174271.), filed by Myndfull Care Management California. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1623-DMS-KSC. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Hooper, Patric)(axi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Notice,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Request,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - OIG Publication,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - CMS Guideline,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Notice,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Notice