Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Colville
Case #: 2:24-cv-01296
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
PNC Bank
Represented By
Christopher Bouriat
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Brianna Schmid
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Acampora
Represented By
Joseph H. Chivers
The Employment Rights Group, LLC
contact info
Brian Schaffer
Fitapelli & Schaffer, LLP
contact info
Dana M Cimera
Fitapelli & Schaffer, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
27 27 respoth Response in Opposition Wed 03/19 3:23 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to26 Notice, filed by PNC Bank. (Bouriat, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Decision, Green v. Brown,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Decision, Weller v. Icahn Sch. of Med. at Mount Sinai
Friday, March 14, 2025
26 26 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Fri 03/14 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Further Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Anthony Acampora (Chivers, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, January 31, 2025
25 25 respm Sur-Reply Fri 01/31 9:09 PM
Sur-Reply re22 Reply Brief, filed by Anthony Acampora. (Chivers, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
24 24 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 01/24 2:21 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. The sur-reply brief,not to exceed three (3) pages, shall be filed within five (5) business days of the date of this Order.. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 1/24/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Leave to File Fri 01/24 2:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Anthony Acampora. (Chivers, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
22 22 respm Reply Brief Wed 01/22 9:48 AM
REPLY BRIEF re17 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by PNC Bank. (Bouriat, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
21 21 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/15 4:34 PM
BRIEF in Opposition re17 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Anthony Acampora. (Chivers, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
20 20 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 12/20 12:24 PM
ORDER granting19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due by 1/15/2025. Reply brief due by 1/22/2025. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 12/20/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 12/20 12:01 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction re9 Amended Complaint by Anthony Acampora. (Chivers, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
18 18 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 12/11 2:13 PM
BRIEF in Support re17 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by PNC Bank. (Bouriat, Christopher)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 12/11 2:11 PM
Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction re9 Amended Complaint by PNC Bank. (Bouriat, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 02, 2024
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/02 4:11 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant has until December 11, 2024 to plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 12/2/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/02 3:47 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re9 Amended Complaint filed by Anthony Acampora by PNC Bank. (Bouriat, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Schmid on behalf of PNC Bank. (Schmid, Brianna)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Mon 12/02 3:40 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by PNC Bank. (Bouriat, Christopher)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Bouriat on behalf of PNC Bank. (Bouriat, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/21 1:55 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Brian Schaffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/21/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Thu 11/21 12:16 PM
MOTION for attorney Brian Schaffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8573034) by Anthony Acampora. (Schaffer, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Brian Schaffer in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/20 12:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against PNC Bank PNC Bank answer due 12/4/2024, filed by Anthony Acampora. (Chivers, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/02 12:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anthony Acampora. PNC Bank waiver sent on 9/23/2024, answer due 11/22/2024. (Chivers, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/19 2:16 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Dana M. Cimera to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 9/19/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Wed 09/18 2:00 PM
MOTION for attorney Dana M. Cimera to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8462758) by Anthony Acampora. (Cimera, Dana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Dana M. Cimera,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, September 13, 2024
5 5 misc Consent to Opt In as Class Member Fri 09/13 10:41 AM
CONSENT TO OPT IN as a class member by Anthony Acampora. (Chivers, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Thu 09/12 3:34 PM
ORDER re 12(b) Motions. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 9/12/24. (cjo)
Related: [-]
3 3 adr Notice of ADR Designation Thu 09/12 3:33 PM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 09/12 9:42 AM
Summons Issued as to PNC Bank (jkn)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 09/12 9:34 AM
Judge Robert J. Colville added. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
1 1 10 pgs cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Wed 09/11 6:08 PM
COMPLAINT against PNC Bank (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8452015), filed by Anthony Acampora. (Chivers, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons