Behrens et al v. US Bank, NA et al
Iowa Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark A Roberts |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-02047 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 12, 2024 9:37 PM CDT |
Defendant
The CME Group, Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chicago Mercantile Exchange
|
|
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
|
|
Defendant
US Bank, NA
|
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Behrens, IA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Behrens, IA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David J Sheffert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherri Sheffert
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/11 1:43 PM
TEXT ORDER granting2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Susan Levy on behalf of Plaintiffs: Upon review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the motion should be granted, on the condition Ms. Levey registers for NextGen by 9/25/2024. Attorney Notice of Appearance due by 9/25/2024. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2024. (eLevy) (klh) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/11 1:34 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION****. (klh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Case Packet | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice - MJ Case Assignment
Wed 09/11 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/10/2024. (klh) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 09/11 1:16 PM
Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. Case opened in the wrong division as 1:24-cv-00097. The case has now been corrected to be 6:24-cv-02047. Clerk notified Financial Department and Attorneys of the corrected case number. (klh) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Corporate/Citizenship Disclosure Deadlines
Wed 09/11 1:55 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff FRCP 7.1(a)(2) Citizenship Disclosure Statement due by 10/11/2024. (klh) |
||
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Susan Levy ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-4240942) by Plaintiffs Bruce Behrens, Kathleen Behrens, David J. Sheffert, Sherri Sheffert. (Day, Joseph) | |
1 | 1 144 pgs COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIANDC-4240925.), filed by David J. Sheffert, Kathleen Behrens, Bruce Behrens, Sherri Sheffert. Scheduling Report due by 12/9/2024 (Day, Joseph) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |