Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00264
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 10:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Yeimy Chavez (2)
Represented By
Keenen Twymon
Federal Defender Program, Inc.
contact info
Suzanne Hashimi
Federal Defender Program Inc.-Atl
contact info
Joseph Blum
Federal Defender Program, Inc.
contact info
Eileen Nicole Moorman
Moorman Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Francisco Ivan Cortez-Camargo (1)
Represented By
David D Marshall
David D. Marshall Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Richard Darity (4)
Represented By
Steven Howard Sadow
Law Office Of Steven H. Sadow, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Melvin Harrell (8)
Represented By
Brian Mendelsohn
The Mendelsohn Ertel Law Group LLC
contact info
Defendant
Juan Ibarra (7)
Represented By
Paul M. Cognac
Law Office Of Paul Cognac
contact info
Defendant
Luis Miguel Montoya-Villagomez (3)
Represented By
Eric Nathan Bernstein
George C. Creal, Jr., P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Edgar Ramirez (6)
Represented By
Joseph Harris Saul
Joseph Saul, Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Quincy Williams (5)
Represented By
Alexis Levine
The Findling Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Zachary Davidson Findling
Findling Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Rebeca Maria Ojeda
Doj-Usao
contact info
Richard Charles Beaulieu
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Bethany Lowe Rupert
Doj-Usao
contact info
Nicholas Louis Evert
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Thursday, July 18, 2024
1 1 15 pgs MAGISTRATE COMPLAINT as to Francisco Ivan Cortez-Camargo (1), Yeimy Chavez (2), Edgar Ramirez (3), Richard Darity (4), Luis Miguel Montoya Villagomez (5), Quincy Williams (6). (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon as to Richard Darity (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon as to Luis Miguel Montoya Villagomez (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs ORDER OF CJA 20-Appointment to Pay Court Appointed Counsel: Appointment of Attorney David D Marshall for Francisco Ivan Cortez-Camargo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/18/2024. (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Francisco Ivan Cortez-Camargo. Preliminary Hearing set for 7/23/2024 at 01:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2022 before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (Tape #FTR) (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Francisco Ivan Cortez-Camargo (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Keenen Twymon - Initial Appearance Only as to Francisco Ivan Cortez-Camargo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/18/2024. (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs MOTION for Detention by USA as to Francisco Ivan Cortez-Camargo. (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing pursuant to Bail Reform Act by Judge Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard as to Francisco Ivan Cortez-Camargo. Detention Hearing set for 7/23/2024 at 01:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2022 before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Keenen Twymon as to Yeimy Chavez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/18/2024. (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Yeimy Chavez. Preliminary Hearing set for 7/23/2024 at 01:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2022 before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (Tape #FTR) (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
13 13 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Yeimy Chavez (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
14 14 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Yeimy Chavez. (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
15 15 Order of Temporary Detention pursuant to Bail Reform Act by Judge Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard as to Yeimy Chavez. Detention Hearing set for 7/23/2024 at 01:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2022 before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER OF CJA 20-Appointment to Pay Court Appointed Counsel: Appointment of Attorney Joseph Harris Saul for Edgar Ramirez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/18/2024. (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Edgar Ramirez. Preliminary Hearing set for 7/23/2024 at 01:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2022 before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (Tape #FTR) (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Keenen Twymon-Initial Appearance Only as to Edgar Ramirez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/18/2024. (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
19 19 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Edgar Ramirez (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
20 20 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Edgar Ramirez. (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
21 21 Order of Temporary Detention pursuant to Bail Reform Act by Judge Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard as to Edgar Ramirez. Detention Hearing set for 7/23/2024 at 01:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2022 before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (ane) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
22 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard: Preliminary Hearing and Pretrial detention hearing held as to Francisco Ivan Cortez-Camargo. Probable cause found; defendant held to District Court. Government motion for detention: Granted. Pretrial detention ordered. Written order to follow. WITNESSES: Cory Walker - TFO DEA. (Exhibits retained to be forwarded to the Clerks Office.) (Tape #FTR) (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Francisco Ivan Cortez-Camargo (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/23/24. (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
24 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard: Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing as to Yeimy Chavez. Probable cause found; defendant held to District Court. Continued to allow Defendant's to secure resources for our bond. WITNESSES: Cory Walker - TFO DEA. (Exhibits retained to be forwarded to the Clerks Office.) (Tape #FTR) (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
25 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard: Preliminary Hearing AND Detention Hearing as to Edgar Ramirez. Probable cause found; defendant held to District Court. Hearing continued to allow Defendant to secure resources for bond. WITNESSES: Cory Walker - TFO DEA. (Exhibits retained to be forwarded to the Clerks Office.) (Tape #FTR) (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
26 26 2 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Steven Howard Sadow appearing on behalf of Richard Darity (Sadow, Steven) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
27 27 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): August 9-16, 2024, by Steven Howard Sadow. (Sadow, Steven) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
28 28 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 2-20, 2024, by Steven Howard Sadow. (Sadow, Steven) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
30 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand: Detention Hearing as to Edgar Ramirez (3). Surety Bond set at $20,000. Bond must be signed by corporate surety. Must surrender passport to PTS. Home detention. Bond filed. Defendant released. (Tape #FTR) (jbu) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
31 31 Surety Bond Entered as to Edgar Ramirez in amount of $ 20,000. Surety: American Surety Company, P.O. Box 68932, Indianapolis, IN 46268. (jbu) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
32 32 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Edgar Ramirez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 7/25/2024. (jbu) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
29 29 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): November 15, November 18-22, November 25-29, December 2-6, December 9-13, December 16-20, and December 23, 2024, by Steven Howard Sadow. (Sadow, Steven) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
34 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand: Bond Release Hearing as to Yeimy Chavez. Bond set at $10,000 corporate surety only. Special conditions: must surrender passport. Bond filed; defendant released. (Tape #FTR) (bgt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
35 35 APPEARANCE BOND entered as to Yeimy Chavez in amount of $10,000, secured by a bail bond with a solvent surety. (bgt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
36 36 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Yeimy Chavez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 7/26/2024. (bgt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
Arrest of Richard Darity. (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
33 33 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Eric Nathan Bernstein appearing for USA. (Bernstein, Eric) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
37 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III: INITIAL APPEARANCE hearing held as to Richard Darity. Preliminary Examination set for 8/8/2024 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1834 before Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins III. Government motion for detention filed. Defendant does not contest detention at this time. (Tape #FTR) (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
38 38 3 pgs MOTION for Detention by USA as to Richard Darity. (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
39 39 1 pgs ORDER granting38 Government's Motion for Detention as to Richard Darity (4). Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on this 29th day of July, 2024. (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
40 40 2 pgs ORDER Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act as to Richard Darity. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 7/29/24. (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
41 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Luis Miguel Montoya Villagomez. Preliminary Examination set for 8/8/2024 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1834 before Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins III. Government motion for detention filed. Defendant does not contest detention at this time. (Tape #FTR) (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
42 42 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Luis Miguel Montoya Villagomez. (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
43 43 ORDER granting42 Governments Motion for Detention as to Luis Miguel Montoya Villagomez (5). Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on this 29th day of July, 2024. (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
44 44 ORDER Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act as to Luis Miguel Montoya Villagomez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 7/29/2024. (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
45 45 Exhibits Audio/Video (Government's Exhibit: 2) admitted and retained at the25 Preliminary Hearing, Detention Hearing,22 Preliminary Hearing, Detention Hearing, 24 Preliminary Hearing, Detention Hearing, as to Francisco Ivan Cortez-Camargo, Yeimy Chavez, Edgar Ramirez have been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks.(sct) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Gov Ex. 2
46 46 EXHIBITS (Government's Exhibits: 1, 3, and 4) admitted and retained at the25 Preliminary Hearing, Detention Hearing,22 Preliminary Hearing, Detention Hearing, 24 Preliminary Hearing, Detention Hearing, as to Francisco Ivan Cortez-Camargo, Yeimy Chavez, Edgar Ramirez have been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks.(sct) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Gov Ex. 1,
Att: 2 Gov Ex. 3,
Att: 3 Gov Ex. 4
47 47 NOTICE TO GOVERNMENT'S COUNSEL OF RECORD regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED Documentary EXHIBITS from the preliminary and detention hearing held on July 23, 2024 pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D. Re:46 Exhibits, (sct) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
48 48 2 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III: Preliminary Hearing as to Richard Darity. Probable cause found; defendant held to District Court. Witness Sworn and Testified: Task Force Officer - Kory Walker. Exhibits: Government's Exhibits ADMITTED: 1, 2 and 3 (Disc), 4, 5, 6, 7, and 8. Exhibits retained to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Tape #FTR) (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
49 49 2 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III: Preliminary Hearing as to Luis Miguel Montoya Villagomez. Probable cause found; defendant held to District Court. Witness Sworn and Testified: Task Force Officer - Kory Walker. Exhibits: Government's Exhibits ADMITTED: 1, 2, and 3 (Disc), 4, 5, 6, 7, and 8. Exhibits retained to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Tape #FTR) (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
50 50 114 pgs TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary and Detention Hearing as to Francisco Ivan Cortez-Camargo, Yeimy Chavez, Edgar Ramirez held on July 23, 2024, before Judge Russell G. Vineyard. Court Reporter, Wynette C. Blathers. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/court-reporter-directory. Redaction Request due 9/3/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2024. (wxb) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Notice of Filing Transcript
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
4 4 1 pgs Defendant Information Sheet as to Francisco Ivan Cortez-Camargo. (ane)
Related: [-]
5 5 Defendant Information Sheet as to Yeimy Chavez. (ane)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs Defendant Information Sheet as to Luis Miguel Montoya-Villagomez. (ane)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs Defendant Information Sheet as to Richard Darity. (ane)
Related: [-]
9 9 Defendant Information Sheet as to Edgar Ramirez. (ane)
Related: [-]
10 10 Defendant Information Sheet as to Juan Ibarra. (ane)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs Defendant Information Sheet as to Melvin Harrell. (ane)
Related: [-]
13 13 Praecipe filed. Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly as to Juan Ibarra (ane)
Related: [-]
14 14 Praecipe filed. Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly as to Melvin Harrell (ane)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs Request for Arraignment as to Richard Darity. (ane)
Related: [-]
16 16 Request for Arraignment as to Luis Miguel Montoya-Villagomez. (ane)
Related: [-]
17 17 Request for Arraignment as to Francisco Ivan Cortez-Camargo. (ane)
Related: [-]
18 18 Request for Arraignment as to Yeimy Chavez. (ane)
Related: [-]
19 19 Request for Arraignment as to Edgar Ramirez. (ane)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs Summons Issued as to Richard Darity. Arraignment set for 8/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2008 before Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (ane)
Related: [-]
51 51 Exhibits Audio/Video (Government's Exhibits: 2 and 3) admitted and retained at the 49 Preliminary Hearing,48 Preliminary Hearing, as to Richard Darity, Luis Miguel Montoya Villagomez have been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks.(sct) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Gov Ex. 2-3
52 52 EXHIBITS (Government's Exhibits: 1, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8) admitted and retained at the 49 Preliminary Hearing,48 Preliminary Hearing, as to Richard Darity, Luis Miguel Montoya Villagomez have been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks.(sct) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Gov Ex. 1,
Att: 2 Gov Ex. 4,
Att: 3 Gov Ex. 5,
Att: 4 Gov Ex. 6,
Att: 5 Gov Ex. 7,
Att: 6 Gov Ex. 8
53 53 1 pgs NOTICE TO GOVERNMENT'S COUNSEL OF RECORD regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED Documentary EXHIBITS from the preliminary hearing held August 8, 2024 pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D. Re:52 Exhibits, (sct) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]
54 54 1 pgs Warrant Returned Executed on 7/29/24 as to Richard Darity. (pdt) [1:24-mj-00618-RDC]
Related: [-]