Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Susan K Declercq
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-12405
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 11, 2025 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Warren Evans
Defendant
Steve Yager
Defendant
Mr. Unknown White
Defendant
Wayne, County of
Defendant
Assad Turfe
Defendant
Kirkpheous Stewart
Defendant
Demetrius Starling
Defendant
Mark Rowland
Defendant
Vivian Malleck
Defendant
Mr. Unknown Johnson
JDF Staff Member 2727 E. Beecher St.
Adrian, MI 49221
Defendant
Elizabeth Hertel
Represented By
Neil Anthony Giovanatti
Mi Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Melissa Fernandez
Defendant
Jane Doe 3
Defendant
Jane Doe 2
Defendant
Jane Doe 1
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Ashleigh Brotherson
Defendant
Christopher Barr
Defendant
Brandon Barber
Plaintiff
Terrance Raynard Burwell
Represented By
Bertram L. Marks
Litigation Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
minutes Status Conference Thu 04/17 2:38 PM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Susan K. DeClercq: Status Conference held on 4/17/2025. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (KBro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
25 25 notice Appearance Wed 04/16 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Allegra Marie Lanni on behalf of Wayne, County of. (Lanni, Allegra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
24 24 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/01 11:06 AM
STIPULATED ORDER Adjourning Status Conference, ( Status Conference reset for 4/17/2025 02:00 PM before District Judge Susan K. DeClercq ) Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
23 23 misc Attorney Appearance Mon 03/24 2:20 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amanda Zack appearing on behalf of Christopher Barr, Vivian Malleck (Zack, Amanda)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Attorney Appearance Mon 03/24 2:17 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Neil Anthony Giovanatti appearing on behalf of Christopher Barr, Vivian Malleck (Giovanatti, Neil)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Appearance Mon 03/24 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Angela L. Baldwin on behalf of Brandon Barber, Warren Evans, Melissa Fernandez, Mark Rowland, Kirkpheous Stewart, Assad Turfe, Wayne, County of. (Baldwin, Angela)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Appearance Mon 03/24 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melvin B. Hollowell on behalf of Brandon Barber, Warren Evans, Melissa Fernandez, Mark Rowland, Kirkpheous Stewart, Assad Turfe, Wayne, County of. (Hollowell, Melvin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
19 19 notice Appear* Fri 03/21 4:31 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Status Conference via Zoom set for 4/1/2020 at 02:30 PM before District Judge Susan K. DeClercq . Zoom information will be emailed prior to conference. (KBro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
18 18 misc Amended Document - NOT Motion Wed 03/19 2:56 PM
AMENDED by Terrance Raynard Burwell Reifman Law Group (Marks, Bertram)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
17 17 order Stipulation and Order Tue 03/18 9:47 AM
STIPULATED ORDER. Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (KBro)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Mon 02/10 3:39 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT. Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (KBro)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
15 15 order Stipulation and Order Fri 12/20 9:56 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (KBro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
14 14 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/10 5:53 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Demetrius Starling served on 12/10/2024, answer due 12/31/2024. (Marks, Bertram)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/10 5:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ashleigh Brotherson served on 12/10/2024, answer due 12/31/2024. (Marks, Bertram)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
12 12 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/09 9:02 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wayne, County of served on 11/20/2024, answer due 12/11/2024. (Marks, Bertram) [No Green Card Returned Executed] Modified on 12/9/2024 (THum)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/09 8:59 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Assad Turfe served on 11/20/2024, answer due 12/11/2024. (Marks, Bertram) [No Green Card Returned Executed] Modified on 12/9/2024 (THum)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/09 8:57 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kirkpheous Stewart served on 11/20/2024, answer due 12/11/2024. (Marks, Bertram) [No Green Card Returned Executed] Modified on 12/9/2024 (THum)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/09 8:51 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mark Rowland served on 11/20/2024, answer due 12/11/2024. (Marks, Bertram) [No Green Card Returned Executed] Modified on 12/9/2024 (THum)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/09 8:50 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Elizabeth Hertel served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024. (Marks, Bertram) [No Green Card Returned Executed] Modified on 12/9/2024 (THum)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/09 8:47 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Melissa Fernandez served on 11/20/2024, answer due 12/11/2024. (Marks, Bertram) [No Green Card Returned Executed] Modified on 12/9/2024 (THum)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/09 8:45 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Warren Evans served on 11/20/2024, answer due 12/11/2024. (Marks, Bertram) [No Green Card Returned Executed] Modified on 12/9/2024 (THum)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/09 8:42 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Brandon Barber served on 11/20/2024, answer due 12/11/2024. (Marks, Bertram) [No Green Card Returned Executed] Modified on 12/9/2024 (THum)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
4 4 misc Attorney Appearance Fri 12/06 2:15 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Neil Anthony Giovanatti appearing on behalf of Elizabeth Hertel (Giovanatti, Neil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
service Request for Additional Summons Wed 11/20 11:02 AM
REQUEST for SUMMONS for Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3. (Marks, Bertram)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
3 3 order Reassignment/Disqualification Mon 09/16 4:22 PM
ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds to District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued* Fri 09/13 11:27 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Brandon Barber, Christopher Barr, Ashleigh Brotherson, Warren Evans, Melissa Fernandez, Elizabeth Hertel, Unknown Johnson, Vivian Malleck, Mark Rowland, Demetrius Starling, Kirkpheous Stewart, Assad Turfe, Wayne, County of, Unknown White, Steve Yager* (SHic)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 09/13 11:28 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SHic)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Thu 09/12 3:59 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Christopher Barr, Mr. White - JDF Staff Member, Elizabeth Hertel, Mr. Johnson - JDF Staff Member, Ashleigh Brotherson, Kirkpheous Stewart, JDF Supervisor 1, Steve Yager, Demetrius Starling, Brandon Barber, Vivian Malleck, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2 against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Marks, Bertram)
Related: [-]
misc Addition of Parties Thu 09/12 3:34 PM
Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendants Wayne County, Warren Evans, Assad Turfe, Melissa Fernandez, Mark Rowland. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Marks, Bertram)
Related: [-]
misc Fee Received Thu 09/12 4:07 PM
FILING FEE Received in the amount of $405 by Terrance Raynard Burwell - Receipt No. AMIEDC-9936962 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (JPar)
Related: [-]