Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas A Varlan
Referred: Debra C Poplin
Case #: 3:24-cv-00374
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Terminated:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 11, 2025 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Blount County Sheriff Office
Defendant
Clayton Hall
Defendant
Maryville Police Department
Plaintiff
General Grant Foreman, III
437223 BLOUNT COUNTY DETENTION CENTER 920 E LAMAR ALEXANDER PARKWAY
MARYVILLE, TN 37804

GPO Nov 07 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by General Grant Foreman, III. Accordingly, the Court RECOMMENDS that the District Judge DENY Plaintiff's Application [Doc. 2]. The Court further RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff be afforded twenty-one (21) days to pay the filing fee. See Report and Recommendations for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 11/07/2024. (Copy of Report and Recommendations mailed to General Grant Foreman, III) (CAT)
GPO Nov 26 2024
ORDER denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; adopting Report and Recommendations re 8 Report and Recommendations. After careful review of the matter, the Court agrees with the magistrate judge's recommendations. Accordingly, the Court ACCEPTS and ADOPTS in full the R&R [Doc. 8] pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2] is DENIED. Plaintiff is afforded twenty-one (21) days from the entry of this Order to pay the filing fee in this matter. Plaintiff is ON NOTICE that failure to comply with this Order, specifically paying the filing fee no later than twenty-one (21) days from entry of this Order, may result in dismissal of his case without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/26/2024. (Copy of Order mailed to General Grant Foreman, III) (CAT)

Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Friday, January 17, 2025
12 12 misc Mail Returned Fri 01/17 2:18 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to General Grant Foreman, III re11 Order Dismissing Case (LCK)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 12/30 2:14 PM
ORDER: This civil matter is before the Court following entry of the Order on November 26, 2024 [Doc. 9], in which the Court accepted and adopted in whole United States Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin's Report and Recommendation ("R&R") [Doc. 8]. In the Court's Order [Doc. 9], plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2] was denied. Further, the Court afforded plaintiff twenty-one (21) days to pay the filing fee in this matter, and he was cautioned that failure to comply may result in dismissal of his case without prejudice [Doc. 9]. More than twenty-one (21) days have passed, and plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee in this matter. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/30/2024. (Copy of Order mailed to last known address listed on docket sheet). (LCK)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
10 10 misc Mail Returned Fri 12/13 12:48 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to General Grant Foreman, III re9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Report and Recommendations. (KDO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Report and Recommendations Tue 11/26 11:20 AM
ORDER denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; adopting Report and Recommendations re 8 Report and Recommendations. After careful review of the matter, the Court agrees with the magistrate judge's recommendations. Accordingly, the Court ACCEPTS and ADOPTS in full the R&R [Doc. 8] pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2] is DENIED . Plaintiff is afforded twenty-one (21) days from the entry of this Order to pay the filing fee in this matter. Plaintiff is ON NOTICE that failure to comply with this Order, specifically paying the filing fee no later than twenty-one (21) days from entry of this Order, may result in dismissal of his case without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/26/2024. (Copy of Order mailed to General Grant Foreman, III) (CAT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
8 8 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 11/07 12:50 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by General Grant Foreman, III. Accordingly, the Court RECOMMENDS that the District Judge DENY Plaintiff's Application [Doc. 2]. The Court further RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff be afforded twenty-one (21) days to pay the filing fee. See Report and Recommendations for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 11/07/2024. (Copy of Report and Recommendations mailed to General Grant Foreman, III) (CAT)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Fri 09/20 1:32 PM
ORDER re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 9/20/2024. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order to pay the full filing fee or to submit the necessary documents. (SLM) (Prisoner account form mailed to General G. Foreman, III, Blount Co. Detention Center, 920 E Lamar Alexander Pkwy, Maryville, TN 37804; Copy of Order mailed to James L. Berrong, Sheriff of Blount County, TN, 940 E Lamar Alexander Pkwy, Maryville, TN 37804)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
6 6 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Thu 09/12 1:12 PM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/12/2024. c/m General Grant Foreman, III 437223, BLOUNT COUNTY DETENTION CENTER, 920 E LAMAR ALEXANDER PARKWAY, MARYVILLE, TN 37804. (MKM)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Thu 09/12 1:12 PM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/12/2024. c/m General Grant Foreman, III 437223, BLOUNT COUNTY DETENTION CENTER, 920 E LAMAR ALEXANDER PARKWAY, MARYVILLE, TN 37804. (MKM)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Thu 09/12 1:11 PM
Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/12/2024. c/m General Grant Foreman, III 437223, BLOUNT COUNTY DETENTION CENTER, 920 E LAMAR ALEXANDER PARKWAY, MARYVILLE, TN 37804. (MKM)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address Thu 09/12 1:10 PM
Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. c/m General Grant Foreman, III 437223, BLOUNT COUNTY DETENTION CENTER, 920 E LAMAR ALEXANDER PARKWAY, MARYVILLE, TN 37804. (MKM)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis (Proceed) Thu 09/12 1:06 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by General Grant Foreman, III.(MKM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Envelope
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/12 1:05 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by General Grant Foreman, III.(MKM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Envelope