Oregon District Court
Judge:Youlee Yim You
Case #: 3:24-cv-01547
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
37 37 minute Rule 16 Conference Wed 03/26 9:58 AM
MINUTES of Proceedings : Pursuant to the parties' agreement, initial disclosures are waived. The deadline to amend pleadings and join parties is June 30, 2025. Fact discovery shall be completed by August 15, 2025. Dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed by September 30, 2025. Expert discovery shall be postponed until dispositive motions have been resolved. The joint ADR report is waived. For information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction, see https://ord.uscourts.gov/consent. Any discovery matters will be handled on an informal basis. Unless otherwise ordered, in the event a discovery motion is filed, no written response to the motion will be required. Judge You does not require a paper judge's copy pursuant to LR 5-10 for filings that are submitted to her for consideration. Juan C. Chavez present as counsel for plaintiff. B. Andrew Jones present as counsel for defendant(s). Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
36 36 order 1 - Scheduling Mon 03/10 11:18 AM
Scheduling Order : RESETTING the March 11, 2025, Telephonic Rule 16 Conference to Wednesday, March 26, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Counsel shall use the call-in information previously provided. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Motion - Miscellaneous Mon 03/10 11:10 AM
Joint Motion for Rule 16 Order . Filed by Lawson Eleazer, Multnomah County, Nicole Morrisey O'Donnell. (Jones, B.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
34 34 order Order Mon 03/03 4:20 PM
ORDER : Admission to practice in the District of Oregon is limited to attorneys with full privileges in good standing with the Oregon State Bar, LR 83-2, subject to the exception for government attorneys set forth in LR 83-4. There is no exception for participants in provisional licensing programs. Therefore, the consent to appearance by provisional licensee33 is stricken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
33 33 notice Notice Mon 02/24 12:35 PM
Notice - Consent to Appearance by Provisional Licensee Filed by William David Kerr. (Chavez, Juan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
32 32 order 1 - Scheduling Tue 02/11 10:28 AM
Scheduling Order : SETTING a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for Tuesday, March 11, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Local Rules 16-2 and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
31 31 oth_ans Pro Bono Appointment Response Form Thu 01/30 4:42 PM
Pro Bono Appointment Response. Representation is accepted as specified in the Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel Related [+] Filed by William David Kerr. (Chavez, Juan)
Related: [-] Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel,,28 .
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 01/14 1:00 PM
ORDER : Granting Motion for Extension of Time29 . Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 2/3/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 1/14/2025.) (pvh)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Extension of Time Tue 01/14 11:54 AM
Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Pro Bono Appointment . Filed by William David Kerr. (Chavez, Juan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
28 28 order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel Fri 01/03 7:52 AM
Order Appointing Juan C. Chavez for William David Kerr as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment) . Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 1/17/2025. Signed on 1/3/2025 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 1/3/2025.) (pjg) (pjg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/3/2025) Attachment Guide for Representing Prisoners
Thursday, January 02, 2025
27 27 order Terminating Pro Bono Counsel Thu 01/02 2:34 PM
Order Terminating P. Andrew McStay, Jr as Pro Bono Counsel. Signed on 1/2/2025 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 1/2/2025.) (pjg)
Related: [-]
26 26 oth_ans Pro Bono Appointment Response Form Thu 01/02 11:59 AM
Pro Bono Appointment Response. Termination of the appointment is requested because of other commitments, including other pro bono matters. Related [+] Filed by William David Kerr. (McStay, P.)
Related: [-] Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel,,25 .
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
25 25 order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel Tue 12/17 11:50 AM
Order Appointing P. Andrew McStay, Jr., for William David Kerr as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment) . Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 12/31/2024. Signed on 12/17/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 12/17/2024.) (pvh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Guide for Representing Prisoners
24 24 order Terminating Pro Bono Counsel Tue 12/17 10:57 AM
Order Terminating Kenneth R. Davis, II as Pro Bono Counsel. Signed on 12/17/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 12/17/2024.) (pvh)
Related: [-]
23 23 oth_ans Pro Bono Appointment Response Form Tue 12/17 9:23 AM
Pro Bono Appointment Response. Due to a conflict, termination of the appointment is requested Related [+] Filed by William David Kerr. (Davis, Kenneth)
Related: [-] Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel,22 .
Monday, December 16, 2024
22 22 order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel Mon 12/16 10:16 AM
Order Appointing Kenneth R. Davis, II for William David Kerr as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment) . Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 12/30/2024. Signed on 12/16/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 12/16/2024.) (pvh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
21 21 order Terminating Pro Bono Counsel Thu 12/12 11:57 AM
Order Terminating Kelly L. Andersen as Pro Bono Counsel. Signed on 12/12/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 12/12/2024.) (pvh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
20 20 oth_ans Pro Bono Appointment Response Form Wed 12/11 11:01 AM
Pro Bono Appointment Response. Termination of the appointment is requested because factors protected under attorney-client privileged Related [+] Filed by William David Kerr. (Andersen, Kelly)
Related: [-] Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel,,19 .
Monday, December 02, 2024
19 19 order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel Mon 12/02 9:33 AM
Order Appointing Kelly L. Andersen for William David Kerr as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment) . Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 12/16/2024. Signed on 12/2/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 12/2/2024.) (pvh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Guide for Representing Prisoners
18 18 order Terminating Pro Bono Counsel Mon 12/02 8:28 AM
Order Terminating Collin C. McKean as Pro Bono Counsel. Signed on 12/2/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 12/2/2024.) (pvh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
17 17 oth_ans Pro Bono Appointment Response Form Wed 11/27 2:15 PM
Pro Bono Appointment Response. Termination of the appointment is requested because My caseload prevents me from taking Mr. Kerr's matter at the present time. Related [+] Filed by William David Kerr. (McKean, Collin)
Related: [-] Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel,,16 .
16 16 order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel Wed 11/27 11:27 AM
Order Appointing Collin C. McKean for William David Kerr as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment) . Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 12/11/2024. Signed on 11/27/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/27/2024.) (pvh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Guide for Representing Prisoners
15 15 order Terminating Pro Bono Counsel Wed 11/27 8:47 AM
Order Terminating Heather Van Meter as Pro Bono Counsel. Signed on 11/27/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/27/2024.) (pvh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
14 14 oth_ans Pro Bono Appointment Response Form Fri 11/01 1:41 PM
Pro Bono Appointment Response. Termination of the appointment is requested because I am currently assigned another pro bono matter and do not have capacity to take on another. Related [+] Filed by William David Kerr. (Van Meter, Heather)
Related: [-] Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel,,13 .
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
13 13 order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel Wed 10/30 3:55 PM
Order Appointing Heather Van Meter for William David Kerr as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment) . Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 11/13/2024. Signed on 10/30/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/30/2024.) (ecp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Guide for Representing Prisoners
12 12 order Terminating Pro Bono Counsel Wed 10/30 3:31 PM
Order Terminating George Goldberg as Pro Bono Counsel. Signed on 10/30/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/30/2024.) (pvh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/28 12:52 PM
Answer to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses . Filed by Lawson Eleazer, Nicole Morrisey O'Donnell, Multnomah County. (Jones, B.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of Service Summons Fri 09/27 12:15 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by Lawson Eleazer, Nicole Morrisey O'Donnell, Multnomah County. (Jones, B.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
9 9 order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel Fri 09/13 2:43 PM
Order Appointing George Goldberg for William David Kerr as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment) . Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 9/27/2024. Signed on 9/13/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 9/13/2024.) (ecp) (ecp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/13/2024) Guide to Representing Prisoners
8 8 order Notice of Lawsuit - Request for Waiver Fri 09/13 12:57 PM
Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons. Notice and complaint mailed to Multnomah County Attorney on 9/13/2024. Waiver of Service is due by 10/15/2024. Signed on 9/13/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 9/13/2024.) (ecp)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT Fri 09/13 12:54 PM
ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND TO COLLECT INMATE FILING FEE: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 2 and to Collect Inmate Filing Fee. IT IS ORDERED that the Oregon Department of Corrections, Central Trust Unit, shall collect payments from the trust account of Plaintiff and shall forward those payments to the Clerk of the Court. A copy of this order has been mailed to Nicole Morrisey O'Donnell, Multnomah County Sheriff, 501 SE Hawthorne Blvd., Suite 350, Portland OR 97214. Signed on 9/13/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 9/13/2024.) (ecp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
6 6 oth_evt Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT Thu 09/12 4:56 PM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 9/12/24.) (eo)
Related: [-]
5 5 oth_sup Declaration Thu 09/12 4:55 PM
Declaration of Rick Flynt. Filed by William David Kerr. (eo)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs oth_sup Memorandum in Support Thu 09/12 4:54 PM
Memorandum in Support of TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Filed by William David Kerr. (eo)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 09/12 4:53 PM
Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by William David Kerr. (eo)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Application for Leave to Proceed IFP Thu 09/12 4:53 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by William David Kerr. (eo)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/12 4:51 PM
Complaint. (IFP Submitted) . Filed by William David Kerr against All Defendants. (eo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet