Oregon District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00340
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2024 12:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Selva Delano Mudaliar (1)
Represented By
Tihanne Mar-Shall
Federal Public Defender Oregon
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mira Chernick
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 1:26 AM PDT
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
1 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You as to Selva Delano Mudaliar (1). (sb) [3:24-mj-00041]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Criminal Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1
Monday, August 19, 2024
3 3 1 pgs Minutes of Proceedings : First Appearance before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You as to Selva Delano Mudaliar (USM #30893-511) held on 8/19/2024. Order appointing AFPD Tihanne Mar-Shall as counsel. Defendant advised of rights and waives a preliminary hearing. Detention Hearing held as Selva Delano Mudaliar (1). Government requests detention on both flight/danger. Defendant does not seek release. Defendant's Location-Custody status is: detained. Brady Disclosure Order: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the government is advised of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. See attached Order. ORDER: SETTING Arraignment for Wednesday, 9/18/2024 at 1:30PM in Portland before the duty magistrate judge. Counsel for the defendant is encouraged to discuss with the defendant the option to waive arraignment in accordance with Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 10(b). Any waiver of arraignment should be filed with the Court once the defendant has been charged by Indictment or Information and ahead of the scheduled arraignment date. Counsel Present for Government: Mira Chernick. Counsel Present for Defendant: Tihanne Mar-Shall. Restraint Order: NR. (Court Reporter Lindsey Weresch) (pvh) [3:24-mj-00041]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to Defendant Selva Delano Mudaliar (USM #30893-511). Signed on 8/19/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) [3:24-mj-00041]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
5 5 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/15/2024 as to Selva Delano Mudaliar. (sb) [3:24-mj-00041]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
6 6 2 pgs Indictment Related [+]as to Selva Delano Mudaliar (1). Count(s): 1: Sex Trafficking by Force, Fraud, or Coercion 2: Transporting an Individual to Engage in Prostitution (gd)
Related: [-] dacted
7 7 Indictment Unredacted Version Filed Under Seal as to Defendant Selva Delano Mudaliar. (gd)
Related: [-]
8 8 Defendant Information Relative to a Criminal Case Sheet as to Defendant Selva Delano Mudaliar. (In accordance with Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1 this form document containing personal data identifiers is filed under seal) . (gd)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (gd)
Related: [-]